|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1916 | 08/1916 | General | Boiler number G288 (Diagram 56) |
||||
1919 | 07/1919 | General | Boiler number D859 (Diagram 56) |
||||
1922 | 08/1922 | General | |||||
Darlington Works | 05/10/1925 | 06/01/1926 | 94 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 21/06/1928 | 27/08/1928 | 68 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 17/06/1929 | 29/07/1929 | 43 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 26/03/1930 | 30/05/1930 | 66 days | General | Boiler number D1392 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/05/1934 | 05/06/1934 | 28 days | General | Rebuilt to class Q5/2 Boiler number D1991 (Diagram 56A) |
||
Darlington Works | 30/08/1938 | 07/10/1938 | 39 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 14/07/1941 | 30/08/1941 | 48 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 06/01/1944 | 29/01/1944 | 24 days | General | Boiler number D1661 (Diagram 56A) |
||
Darlington Works | 19/11/1945 | 21/12/1945 | 33 days | Light Repair | After collision |
||
Darlington Works | 10/12/1946 | 01/02/1947 | 54 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3301 |
||
Gateshead Works | 30/11/1948 | 30/11/1948 | 1 day | No repairs |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
28/02/1949 | Darlington Works (To scrap yard) | Locomotives awaiting Works during February included:-Nos. 1274, 1605/11/18/31/45, 2745/67, 3199, 3411, 5096, 5606/28, 5800, 7262, 8708, 9105, 60816, 60133, (adjustment), 61015 (damaged), 63140, 65057 (damaged in the Crook derailment), 65712, 67705/54, 69827 (NEA), Class '8' W.D. 77320 an 79239.To scrap yard: Nos. 3291/97/99, 3301/08/17/32, 63322 (badly damaged at Old Town Jct., Middlesboro').Locomotives ex Works during February included:-Nos. 60141, 60142 (Darlington 2061/1949-the first 1949 locomotive), 60143, 60509 (light repair), 60923, 60931 (light repair), 61022 (unlined black), 61161 (lined out), 61162 (unlined black), 61181/86, 61237/58, 61400, 61635/41, 61659 (light repair), 61660, 62353/59/78, 62718/32/64, 63341/49, 65098, 65601, 65633 (repaired at Gateshead-buffer beam snow plough fitted), 65712/49, 65827/60, 67255, 67386, 67623, 67714 (light repair), 68010/39, 68160, 68260, 69933, Class '8' W.D. 90252 (ex 77352), 90344 (ex 70877), 90613 (ex 77469). | SLS/194904 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1907 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 660 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 517 Allocated to Stockton (SKN) Diagram 56 boiler fitted |
||
05/10/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/10/1925. Dep: 06/01/1926. | ||
21/06/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 21/06/1928. Dep: 27/08/1928. | ||
17/06/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/06/1929. Dep: 29/07/1929. | ||
26/03/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/03/1930. Dep: 30/05/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1392 (Diagram 56) |
||
25/06/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haverton Hill (HAV) | ||
09/05/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/05/1934. Dep: 05/06/1934. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class Q5/2 Boiler number D1991 (Diagram 56A) |
||
30/08/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/08/1938. Dep: 07/10/1938. | ||
14/07/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/07/1941. Dep: 30/08/1941. | ||
06/01/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/01/1944. Dep: 29/01/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1661 (Diagram 56A) |
||
19/11/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/11/1945. Dep: 21/12/1945. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
10/12/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/12/1946. Dep: 01/02/1947. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3301 |
||
30/11/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (No repairs) - Arr: 30/11/1948. Dep: 30/11/1948. | ||
31/12/1948 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 3301 from Haverton Hill (HAV) | ||
1949 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 63301 but not taken up | ||
02/1949 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |