|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1922 | 11/1922 | General | Boiler number D1432 (Diagram 56) |
||||
Gateshead Works | 23/08/1927 | 28/10/1927 | 67 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 12/07/1932 | 25/08/1932 | 45 days | General | Boiler number D1023 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/10/1935 | 10/01/1936 | 78 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 19/07/1939 | 19/02/1940 | 216 days | General | Boiler number 3117 (Diagram 56B) |
||
Darlington Works | 01/07/1942 | 11/08/1942 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 2802 (Diagram 56B) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/08/1943 | 29/09/1943 | 51 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 03/05/1944 | 25/05/1944 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 3249 (Diagram 56B) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/05/1947 | 21/06/1947 | 44 days | General | Boiler number D1955 (Diagram 56) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1907 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1031 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 519 Allocated to Blyth (North) (NBH) Diagram 56 boiler fitted |
||
23/08/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 23/08/1927. Dep: 28/10/1927. | ||
05/06/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Shildon (SHI) | ||
12/07/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/07/1932. Dep: 25/08/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1023 (Diagram 56) |
||
07/01/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
25/10/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/10/1935. Dep: 10/01/1936. | ||
15/07/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (SEL) | ||
19/07/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/07/1939. Dep: 19/02/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3117 (Diagram 56B) |
||
01/07/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/07/1942. Dep: 11/08/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2802 (Diagram 56B) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL) | ||
10/08/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/08/1943. Dep: 29/09/1943. | ||
03/05/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1944. Dep: 25/05/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3249 (Diagram 56B) |
||
20/01/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3303 | ||
09/05/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/05/1947. Dep: 21/06/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1955 (Diagram 56) |
||
11/07/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Borough Gardens (BOR) | ||
17/07/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Borough Gardens (BOR) | ||
1949 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 63303 but not taken up | ||
23/04/1951 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 3303 from Borough Gardens (54C) | ||
05/1951 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |