|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 16/02/1925 | 01/05/1925 | 75 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 21/06/1928 | 24/08/1928 | 65 days | General | Boiler number D1967 (Diagram 50) |
||
Gateshead Works | 24/04/1931 | 29/05/1931 | 36 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 04/05/1934 | 14/06/1934 | 42 days | General | Boiler number D951 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/05/1936 | 28/05/1936 | 18 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 19/10/1937 | 09/12/1937 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 2429 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/12/1940 | 25/02/1941 | 71 days | General | Boiler number 24175 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 29/04/1943 | 10/06/1943 | 43 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 02/10/1945 | 23/10/1945 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 16/01/1947 | 22/03/1947 | 66 days | General | Boiler number 2874 (Diagram 50) |
||
Gateshead Works | 07/06/1948 | 16/06/1948 | 10 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 63347 |
||
Darlington Works | 30/05/1950 | 07/07/1950 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 2566 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 30/10/1951 | 30/10/1951 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 31/03/1953 | 02/05/1953 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 24290 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 26/09/1955 | 21/10/1955 | 26 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 04/05/1956 | 07/06/1956 | 35 days | Light Casual | |||
Gateshead Works | 15/01/1958 | 14/02/1958 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 24295 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/03/1958 | 21/03/1958 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 28/08/1961 | 23/09/1961 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 24224 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/10/1961 | 18/10/1961 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 05/06/1962 | 14/06/1962 | 10 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
18/01/1964 | Darlington MPD (Repair Shops Under Light Repairs) | Stored: 46415/73, 61004/255, 63441, 65852/64/91, 68024, 69020, 90100/249/301/655. Ex Works 73138, 75052/58, 90149. Repair Shops Under Light Repairs: 42477, 62059, 63347, 90011. Visitor on Enthusiast Special: 70000. | SLS/196402 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/1913 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1254 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Tyne Dock (TDK) Diagram 50 boiler fitted |
||
08/03/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Borough Gardens (BOR) | ||
16/02/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1925. Dep: 01/05/1925. | ||
28/12/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
20/06/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Borough Gardens (BOR) | ||
21/06/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/06/1928. Dep: 24/08/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1967 (Diagram 50) |
||
24/04/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 24/04/1931. Dep: 29/05/1931. | ||
04/05/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1934. Dep: 14/06/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number D951 (Diagram 50) |
||
11/05/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/05/1936. Dep: 28/05/1936. | ||
19/10/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/10/1937. Dep: 09/12/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2429 (Diagram 50) |
||
12/04/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
17/12/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/12/1940. Dep: 25/02/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24175 (Diagram 50) |
||
29/04/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/04/1943. Dep: 10/06/1943. | ||
08/09/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
23/07/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
02/10/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/10/1945. Dep: 23/10/1945. | ||
14/04/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3347 | ||
16/01/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/01/1947. Dep: 22/03/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2874 (Diagram 50) |
||
07/06/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/06/1948. Dep: 16/06/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63347 |
||
30/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/05/1950. Dep: 07/07/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2566 (Diagram 50) |
||
30/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 30/10/1951. Dep: 30/10/1951. | ||
31/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1953. Dep: 02/05/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24290 (Diagram 50A) |
||
26/09/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 26/09/1955. Dep: 21/10/1955. | ||
04/05/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/05/1956. Dep: 07/06/1956. | ||
10/06/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haverton Hill (51G) | ||
15/01/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1958. Dep: 14/02/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24295 (Diagram 50A) |
||
13/03/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/03/1958. Dep: 21/03/1958. | ||
14/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) | ||
28/08/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/08/1961. Dep: 23/09/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24224 (Diagram 50A) |
||
10/10/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/10/1961. Dep: 18/10/1961. | ||
01/04/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Auckland (51F) | ||
05/06/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/06/1962. Dep: 14/06/1962. | ||
12/01/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C) | ||
18/10/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63347 from West Hartlepool (51C) |