|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 1922 | 07/1922 | General | Boiler number D1170 (Diagram 50) |
|||
Darlington Works | 21/05/1924 | 20/08/1924 | 92 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 11/10/1927 | 29/12/1927 | 80 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 25/01/1929 | 15/02/1929 | 22 days | General | Boiler number D863 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/05/1930 | 08/08/1930 | 88 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 23/03/1933 | 27/04/1933 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 2437 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/09/1935 | 25/10/1935 | 31 days | General | Boiler number AW30 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/05/1938 | 09/07/1938 | 60 days | General | Boiler number AW4 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/09/1940 | 17/10/1940 | 31 days | General | Tender 0nly Boiler number 2387 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/06/1943 | 06/07/1943 | 29 days | General | Boiler number HL106 (Diagram 50) |
||
Gateshead Works | 27/09/1945 | 15/10/1945 | 19 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 27/12/1946 | 01/03/1947 | 65 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 04/03/1947 | 11/03/1947 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 17/10/1948 | 03/11/1948 | 18 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 63360 |
||
Gateshead Works | 30/11/1948 | 15/12/1948 | 16 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 08/05/1950 | 17/06/1950 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 2820 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 19/06/1950 | 22/06/1950 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 26/06/1950 | 05/07/1950 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 14/08/1950 | 25/08/1950 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 18/12/1952 | 20/01/1953 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 24249 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 29/04/1955 | 28/05/1955 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 24206 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 31/05/1955 | 02/06/1955 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 16/10/1957 | 16/10/1957 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Gateshead Works | 05/11/1957 | 06/12/1957 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 24232 (Diagram 50) |
||
Gateshead Works | 17/02/1958 | 26/02/1958 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 20/08/1959 | 02/09/1959 | 14 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 01/02/1960 | 12/02/1960 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 12/03/1962 | 13/04/1962 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 24216 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/02/1964 | 10/02/1964 | 1 day | Weighing |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
25/03/1962 | Darlington Works (Stripping Shop Yard) | Erecting Shop: D4094 (Complete), D4158-60 (Engines in), D4161-5 (Frames), D15/30, D248/56, D2265, D3071, D3138, D3943, 46450, 60882/5, 60901/57, 61240/88, 63399, 63420/48/63/71, 65099, 90351, 92144/98, 92201. Stripping Shop: 46476, 60804, 65763. Stripping Shop Yard: 43117, 61013, 61256, 63360, 63443, 67752, 90068/81. Works Yard: D2113, D4091/2, D5174, 43129, 46460/7, 60816/55. 60954, 67609/61, 68024/35/64, 90333, 92097, 92194, Crossing: D2164, D2230, D2589, D3229/43. Test House: D4093, D5175. Scrap Yard: 61411/2/3/5/9/22/43/50/1/60, 64979, 65741/51/69, 67707/39/50/3/75, 68063, 68680/8/9, 68703/29/34 all complete with 60960/77, 61368, 67665/81 partially cut up. | SLS/196205 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1913 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1288 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Selby (SEL) Diagram 50 boiler fitted |
||
1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: ?/1922. Dep: ?/07/1922. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1170 (Diagram 50) |
||
21/05/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/05/1924. Dep: 20/08/1924. | ||
11/10/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/10/1927. Dep: 29/12/1927. | ||
25/01/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/01/1929. Dep: 15/02/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number D863 (Diagram 50) |
||
13/05/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/05/1930. Dep: 08/08/1930. | ||
23/03/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/03/1933. Dep: 27/04/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2437 (Diagram 50) |
||
25/09/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/09/1935. Dep: 25/10/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number AW30 (Diagram 50) |
||
11/05/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1938. Dep: 09/07/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number AW4 (Diagram 50) |
||
16/08/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
17/09/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/09/1940. Dep: 17/10/1940. Work undertaken: Tender 0nly Boiler number 2387 (Diagram 50) |
||
08/06/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/06/1943. Dep: 06/07/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number HL106 (Diagram 50) |
||
27/09/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/09/1945. Dep: 15/10/1945. | ||
28/04/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3360 | ||
27/12/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/12/1946. Dep: 01/03/1947. | ||
04/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/03/1947. Dep: 11/03/1947. | ||
07/02/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
17/10/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/10/1948. Dep: 03/11/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63360 |
||
30/11/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/11/1948. Dep: 15/12/1948. | ||
08/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/05/1950. Dep: 17/06/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2820 (Diagram 50) |
||
19/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/06/1950. Dep: 22/06/1950. | ||
26/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/06/1950. Dep: 05/07/1950. | ||
14/08/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/08/1950. Dep: 25/08/1950. | ||
18/12/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/12/1952. Dep: 20/01/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24249 (Diagram 50A) |
||
29/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/04/1955. Dep: 28/05/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24206 (Diagram 50) |
||
31/05/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/05/1955. Dep: 02/06/1955. | ||
16/10/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 16/10/1957. Dep: 16/10/1957. | ||
05/11/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1957. Dep: 06/12/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24232 (Diagram 50) |
||
17/02/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/02/1958. Dep: 26/02/1958. | ||
01/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) | ||
20/08/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/08/1959. Dep: 02/09/1959. | ||
01/02/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/02/1960. Dep: 12/02/1960. | ||
12/03/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1962. Dep: 13/04/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24216 (Diagram 50) |
||
02/12/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (52H) | ||
10/02/1964 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 10/02/1964. Dep: 10/02/1964. | ||
26/06/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63360 from Tyne Dock (52H) |