|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 19/11/1923 | 02/02/1924 | 76 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 20/06/1927 | 21/10/1927 | 124 days | General | Boiler number 20 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/06/1930 | 28/08/1930 | 79 days | General | Boiler number D918 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 05/07/1933 | 14/08/1933 | 41 days | General | Boiler number E4/10 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 14/04/1936 | 22/09/1936 | 162 days | General | Boiler number 2817 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/11/1938 | 28/11/1938 | 20 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 23/01/1939 | 07/03/1939 | 44 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 28/05/1941 | 03/07/1941 | 37 days | General | Boiler number D1941 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/05/1943 | 31/05/1943 | 28 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 28/02/1944 | 20/03/1944 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 2639 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/03/1946 | 06/04/1946 | 29 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3367 |
||
Darlington Works | 27/12/1946 | 08/03/1947 | 72 days | General | Boiler number 2820 (Diagram 50) |
||
Gateshead Works | 10/11/1948 | 25/11/1948 | 16 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 63367 |
||
Darlington Works | 28/12/1949 | 19/01/1950 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 2639 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 26/01/1950 | 01/02/1950 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 23/06/1952 | 12/07/1952 | 20 days | General | Boiler number 24232 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 14/07/1952 | 16/07/1952 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 02/09/1953 | 01/10/1953 | 30 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 28/10/1954 | 25/11/1954 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 24210 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/05/1957 | 01/06/1957 | 20 days | General | Boiler number 24260 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/06/1957 | 05/06/1957 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 14/06/1957 | 24/06/1957 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 01/12/1958 | 12/01/1959 | 43 days | Light Casual | Derailment damage |
||
Darlington Works | 03/11/1959 | 05/11/1959 | 3 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 26/05/1960 | 06/07/1960 | 42 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 22/06/1961 | 12/08/1961 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 24326 (Diagram 50A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
09/07/1961 | Darlington Works (Stripping Shop Yard) | Erecting Shop: D242, D2243/6/8, D2700, D3456, D4073-6, D5160-4, 60803/80/99, 61322, 61457, 63354, 63401/65, 65825, 77012, 78022, 80075, 90061, 90405/26, 92197. Stripping Shop: 61437. Stripping Shop Yard: 60882, 60935/71, 63367, 63417/66, 65760, 77011. Works Yard: D239/78/80, D5158, 43051, 43126/33/4/41, 46480, 60802/55, 60903/63, 63441, 65099, 65761/90, 65820/84, 67643/58, 67760, 68040/7/50, 90089, 92175. Crossing: D13, D4072, D5159. Stooperdale: 90074. Scrap Yard, (i) Complete Locos: 61432/45, 67665, 67707/19/32/8/40, DEPT54. Scrap Yard, (ii) Parts of Locos: 61455, 68080, 68316, 69105, 69921. | SLS/196108 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1913 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1361 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Tyne Dock (TDK) Diagram 50 boiler fitted |
||
19/11/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 19/11/1923. Dep: 02/02/1924. | ||
08/03/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
20/06/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 20/06/1927. Dep: 21/10/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number 20 (Diagram 50) |
||
02/01/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
11/06/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/06/1930. Dep: 28/08/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number D918 (Diagram 50) |
||
05/07/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/07/1933. Dep: 14/08/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number E4/10 (Diagram 50) |
||
14/04/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/04/1936. Dep: 22/09/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2817 (Diagram 50) |
||
09/11/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/11/1938. Dep: 28/11/1938. | ||
23/01/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/01/1939. Dep: 07/03/1939. | ||
28/05/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/05/1941. Dep: 03/07/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1941 (Diagram 50) |
||
04/05/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/05/1943. Dep: 31/05/1943. | ||
28/02/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/02/1944. Dep: 20/03/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2639 (Diagram 50) |
||
05/03/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL) | ||
09/03/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/03/1946. Dep: 06/04/1946. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3367 |
||
27/12/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/12/1946. Dep: 08/03/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2820 (Diagram 50) |
||
02/11/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stockton (SKN) | ||
10/11/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/11/1948. Dep: 25/11/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63367 |
||
06/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haverton Hill (HAV) | ||
12/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haverton Hill (HAV) | ||
28/12/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/12/1949. Dep: 19/01/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2639 (Diagram 50) |
||
26/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/01/1950. Dep: 01/02/1950. | ||
23/06/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1952. Dep: 12/07/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24232 (Diagram 50) |
||
14/07/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/07/1952. Dep: 16/07/1952. | ||
02/09/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/09/1953. Dep: 01/10/1953. | ||
28/10/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1954. Dep: 25/11/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24210 (Diagram 50A) |
||
13/05/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/05/1957. Dep: 01/06/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24260 (Diagram 50A) |
||
03/06/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/06/1957. Dep: 05/06/1957. | ||
14/06/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/06/1957. Dep: 24/06/1957. | ||
01/12/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/12/1958. Dep: 12/01/1959. Work undertaken: Derailment damage |
||
14/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) | ||
03/11/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/11/1959. Dep: 05/11/1959. | ||
26/05/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 26/05/1960. Dep: 06/07/1960. | ||
22/06/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/06/1961. Dep: 12/08/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24326 (Diagram 50A) |
||
07/07/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sunderland (52G) | ||
31/08/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63367 from Sunderland (52G) |