|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 1921 | 10/1921 | General | Boiler number D167 (Diagram 50) |
|||
Darlington Works | 28/08/1923 | 16/11/1923 | 81 days | General | Boiler number D164 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/07/1926 | 23/11/1926 | 140 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 20/06/1929 | 16/08/1929 | 58 days | General | Boiler number 2262 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/07/1932 | 15/08/1932 | 41 days | General | Boiler number E4/28 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/06/1935 | 02/08/1935 | 60 days | General | Boiler number HL106 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 15/02/1937 | 14/04/1937 | 59 days | Heavy | Boiler number 24230 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/12/1938 | 23/01/1939 | 52 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 10/04/1940 | 02/05/1940 | 23 days | Heavy | |||
Darlington Works | 21/07/1941 | 20/08/1941 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 2815 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/09/1941 | 06/09/1941 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 10/02/1944 | 07/03/1944 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 2810 (Diagram 50) |
||
Gateshead Works | 13/06/1945 | 28/06/1945 | 16 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 02/08/1946 | 06/09/1946 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 24187 (Diagram 50A) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3368 |
||
Darlington Works | 12/09/1946 | 18/09/1946 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 16/10/1947 | 10/11/1947 | 26 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 31/12/1948 | 02/02/1949 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 3157 (Diagram 50A) Renumbered to BR 63368 |
||
Darlington Works | 20/02/1951 | 17/03/1951 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 24270 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 19/03/1951 | 21/03/1951 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 28/05/1953 | 20/06/1953 | 24 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 22/06/1953 | 25/06/1953 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 30/06/1953 | 02/07/1953 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 02/09/1955 | 01/10/1955 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 24240 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/10/1955 | 04/10/1955 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 10/04/1958 | 16/05/1958 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 24300 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/11/1959 | 12/11/1959 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 16/04/1962 | 19/05/1962 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 24281 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 01/06/1962 | 06/07/1962 | 36 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 10/07/1962 | 07/08/1962 | 29 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 09/08/1962 | 15/08/1962 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 14/10/1964 | 14/10/1964 | 1 day | Weighing |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/12/1948 | Darlington Works | Locomotives awaiting Works during December included:-Nos. 952, 1437, 1625/41, 2378, 2970 (the last 'C.7'), 3368, 5639, 5650 (badly damaged at Jervaulx), 5693, 5759/97, 5807, 7278, 7651, 8010/37, 8155, 8292, 9792, 9892, 60510, 62732/33, 65056, 67704/05/10/19/23, 69910/33, 'Austerity' 70877, 77414/69. Locomotives ex Works during December included:-Nos. 60918/42/70, 61432, 61601/29/30/51, 62344/65, 62728/31/54, 63352, 63423, 65033, 65856, 67283, 67342, 67636/39/87, 67701, 68016 (altered bunker), 68264/75, 68436, 68696, 68745, 69102, 69794, 69842/79/89, 'Austerity' 77329. Locomotives broken up: Nos. 2390 an 3327. The two Class 'V.2's' which have hitherto been used as main line pilots, have now been replaced by Class 'A.3' Nos. 70 an 76. | SLS/194902 |
14/07/1962 | Darlington Works (Sidings) | Erecting Shop: D15, D238, D347, D2232/42, D2701, D3075, D3237, D5112, D4190-2 undercoats, D4193-5 motors fitted to body shells, 43054, 60876, 60955/7, 61018, 63343, 63409/10/26, 68037, 90322, 90622/51, 92061/2. Stripping Shop: 65786, 90008, 90132. Outside Stripping Shop: 63423, 65757. Crossing: D24, D244/6/83, D2604. Diesel Shunter Test House: D4189 painted. Sidings: 60953/62/81, 61010, 63368, 63456, 65099, 65720, 65807, 67634, 67788, 68014, 69026, 90113, 92034. Scrap Yard: 61077 being cut up, 61063, 61265/98, 61415/9/43/50/1, 65693, 65751, 67666, 67753/95 partially dismantled, 61411-3/60, 65695, 65741, 67601/23/60, 67707/47/50/75, 68052, 68707, 69017/97 intact. | SLS/196209 |
03/12/1966 | Allocation of Q6 class (West Hartlepool) | Tyne Dock: 63344/66/81/7, 63413/20/6/9/31/55/8; Sunderland: 63346/95, 63405/36/7; West Hartlepool: 63368/94/7, 63407/40/50. | SLS/196701 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1913 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1362 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Selby (SEL) Diagram 50 boiler fitted |
||
1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: ?/1921. Dep: ?/10/1921. Work undertaken: Boiler number D167 (Diagram 50) |
||
28/08/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/08/1923. Dep: 16/11/1923. Work undertaken: Boiler number D164 (Diagram 50) |
||
07/07/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/07/1926. Dep: 23/11/1926. | ||
20/06/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/06/1929. Dep: 16/08/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2262 (Diagram 50) |
||
18/11/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
06/07/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/07/1932. Dep: 15/08/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number E4/28 (Diagram 50) |
||
04/06/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/06/1935. Dep: 02/08/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number HL106 (Diagram 50) |
||
15/02/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 15/02/1937. Dep: 14/04/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24230 (Diagram 50) |
||
03/12/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/12/1938. Dep: 23/01/1939. | ||
10/04/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 10/04/1940. Dep: 02/05/1940. | ||
18/05/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
21/07/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/07/1941. Dep: 20/08/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2815 (Diagram 50) |
||
02/09/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/09/1941. Dep: 06/09/1941. | ||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
08/07/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
10/02/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/02/1944. Dep: 07/03/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2810 (Diagram 50) |
||
02/10/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
13/06/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/06/1945. Dep: 28/06/1945. | ||
23/07/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL) | ||
02/08/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/08/1946. Dep: 06/09/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24187 (Diagram 50A) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3368 |
||
12/09/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/09/1946. Dep: 18/09/1946. | ||
05/10/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID) | ||
16/10/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/10/1947. Dep: 10/11/1947. | ||
31/12/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/12/1948. Dep: 02/02/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3157 (Diagram 50A) Renumbered to BR 63368 |
||
20/02/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/02/1951. Dep: 17/03/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24270 (Diagram 50A) |
||
19/03/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/03/1951. Dep: 21/03/1951. | ||
28/05/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 28/05/1953. Dep: 20/06/1953. | ||
22/06/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/06/1953. Dep: 25/06/1953. | ||
30/06/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/06/1953. Dep: 02/07/1953. | ||
02/09/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/09/1955. Dep: 01/10/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24240 (Diagram 50A) |
||
03/10/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/10/1955. Dep: 04/10/1955. | ||
10/04/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 10/04/1958. Dep: 16/05/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24300 (Diagram 50A) |
||
01/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) | ||
08/11/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (52C) | ||
10/11/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/11/1959. Dep: 12/11/1959. | ||
20/08/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Consett (52K) | ||
16/04/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/04/1962. Dep: 19/05/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24281 (Diagram 50A) |
||
01/06/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/06/1962. Dep: 06/07/1962. | ||
10/07/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/07/1962. Dep: 07/08/1962. | ||
09/08/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/08/1962. Dep: 15/08/1962. | ||
14/10/1964 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 14/10/1964. Dep: 14/10/1964. | ||
23/05/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C) | ||
31/12/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63368 from West Hartlepool (51C) |