09/1913 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1363 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Tyne Dock (TDK) |
|
|
1922 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: ?/1922. Dep: ?/10/1922. |
|
|
12/04/1926 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1926. Dep: 04/08/1926. |
|
|
05/10/1928 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/10/1928. Dep: 01/11/1928. |
|
|
31/07/1929 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/07/1929. Dep: 03/08/1929. |
|
|
25/04/1930 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1930. Dep: 06/06/1930. |
|
|
07/08/1930 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/08/1930. Dep: 18/08/1930. |
|
|
18/05/1931 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/05/1931. Dep: 09/06/1931. |
|
|
22/10/1934 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/10/1934. Dep: 28/12/1934. |
|
|
26/05/1938 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/05/1938. Dep: 17/08/1938. |
|
|
09/06/1941 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/06/1941. Dep: 11/07/1941. |
|
|
28/03/1943 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) |
|
|
14/07/1943 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/07/1943. Dep: 26/08/1943. |
|
|
08/09/1944 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) |
|
|
23/07/1945 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL) |
|
|
08/08/1945 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/08/1945. Dep: 24/08/1945. |
|
|
01/09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3369 |
|
|
19/12/1946 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/12/1946. Dep: 22/02/1947. |
|
|
02/11/1947 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stockton (SKN) |
|
|
24/10/1949 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/10/1949. Dep: 12/11/1949. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63369
|
|
|
25/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D) |
|
|
30/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D) |
|
|
20/11/1951 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/11/1951. Dep: 15/12/1951. |
|
|
17/12/1951 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/12/1951. Dep: 21/12/1951. |
|
|
12/11/1953 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 12/11/1953. Dep: 05/12/1953. |
|
|
07/12/1953 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/12/1953. Dep: 08/12/1953. |
|
|
19/04/1956 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/04/1956. Dep: 31/05/1956. |
|
|
01/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
29/05/1959 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/05/1959. Dep: 24/06/1959. |
|
|
30/06/1959 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/06/1959. Dep: 29/07/1959. |
|
|
19/10/1959 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/10/1959. Dep: 23/10/1959. |
|
|
29/02/1960 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/02/1960. Dep: 19/04/1960. Work undertaken: 24303 24/6/59 b50A
|
|
|
15/07/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 63369 from Thornaby (51L) |
|
|