|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 29/07/1923 | 24/10/1923 | 88 days | General | Boiler number D190 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/05/1926 | 24/09/1926 | 121 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 11/07/1928 | 20/09/1928 | 72 days | General | Boiler number D139 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/06/1931 | 11/08/1931 | 48 days | General | Boiler number D951 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 22/03/1934 | 21/04/1934 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 2566 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 23/04/1934 | 26/04/1934 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 19/12/1938 | 07/02/1939 | 51 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 11/03/1941 | 16/04/1941 | 37 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 26/10/1943 | 20/11/1943 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 2394 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 21/08/1945 | 18/09/1945 | 29 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 08/01/1946 | 05/02/1946 | 29 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 24/02/1946 | 14/03/1946 | 19 days | Unclassified | Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3371 |
||
Darlington Works | 03/06/1947 | 05/07/1947 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 24247 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/04/1950 | 06/05/1950 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 24246 (Diagram 50A) Renumbered to BR 63371 |
||
Darlington Works | 08/05/1950 | 11/05/1950 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 22/10/1952 | 15/11/1952 | 25 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 17/11/1952 | 19/11/1952 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 17/06/1954 | 23/07/1954 | 37 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 13/06/1955 | 02/07/1955 | 20 days | General | Boiler number 24154 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/07/1955 | 05/07/1955 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 11/07/1955 | 14/07/1955 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 25/11/1957 | 27/12/1957 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 24274 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/02/1960 | 13/02/1960 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 18/09/1961 | 04/11/1961 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 24295 (Diagram 50A) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/1917 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2214 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Selby (SEL) Diagram 50 boiler fitted |
||
29/07/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/07/1923. Dep: 24/10/1923. Work undertaken: Boiler number D190 (Diagram 50) |
||
27/05/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/05/1926. Dep: 24/09/1926. | ||
11/07/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/07/1928. Dep: 20/09/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number D139 (Diagram 50) |
||
25/06/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1931. Dep: 11/08/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number D951 (Diagram 50) |
||
22/03/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1934. Dep: 21/04/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2566 (Diagram 50) |
||
23/04/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/04/1934. Dep: 26/04/1934. | ||
05/07/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sunderland (SUN) | ||
15/01/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Borough Gardens (BOR) | ||
19/12/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/12/1938. Dep: 07/02/1939. | ||
15/02/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
11/03/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1941. Dep: 16/04/1941. | ||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
26/10/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/10/1943. Dep: 20/11/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2394 (Diagram 50) |
||
21/08/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/08/1945. Dep: 18/09/1945. | ||
08/01/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/01/1946. Dep: 05/02/1946. | ||
24/02/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/02/1946. Dep: 14/03/1946. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3371 |
||
03/06/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/06/1947. Dep: 05/07/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24247 (Diagram 50) |
||
07/02/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
11/04/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/04/1950. Dep: 06/05/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24246 (Diagram 50A) Renumbered to BR 63371 |
||
08/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/05/1950. Dep: 11/05/1950. | ||
22/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 22/10/1952. Dep: 15/11/1952. | ||
17/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/11/1952. Dep: 19/11/1952. | ||
17/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/06/1954. Dep: 23/07/1954. | ||
13/06/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1955. Dep: 02/07/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24154 (Diagram 50A) |
||
04/07/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/07/1955. Dep: 05/07/1955. | ||
11/07/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/07/1955. Dep: 14/07/1955. | ||
25/11/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1957. Dep: 27/12/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24274 (Diagram 50A) |
||
01/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) | ||
08/02/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/02/1960. Dep: 13/02/1960. | ||
18/09/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/09/1961. Dep: 04/11/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24295 (Diagram 50A) |
||
07/07/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (52H) | ||
07/11/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63371 from Tyne Dock (52H) |