|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 1922 | 12/1922 | General | Boiler number D156 (Diagram 50) |
|||
Gateshead Works | 29/09/1924 | 03/12/1924 | 66 days | General | Boiler number D192 (Diagram 50) |
||
Gateshead Works | 12/12/1927 | 28/03/1928 | 108 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 09/02/1931 | 17/03/1931 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 2384 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/03/1935 | 01/05/1935 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 2652 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 19/01/1938 | 25/03/1938 | 66 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 13/03/1940 | 29/03/1940 | 17 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 11/12/1940 | 09/01/1941 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 3155 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/10/1943 | 03/02/1944 | 114 days | General | Boiler number 2989 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 28/02/1947 | 03/05/1947 | 65 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 06/05/1947 | 31/05/1947 | 26 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 06/12/1948 | 20/12/1948 | 15 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 63388 |
||
Darlington Works | 01/02/1950 | 15/04/1950 | 74 days | General | Boiler number 24213 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 23/11/1951 | 20/12/1951 | 28 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 10/01/1953 | 07/02/1953 | 29 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 10/02/1953 | 17/02/1953 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 14/07/1955 | 06/08/1955 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 24181 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/08/1955 | 09/08/1955 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 02/04/1958 | 01/05/1958 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 24268 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/05/1958 | 20/05/1958 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 13/08/1959 | 17/08/1959 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 08/09/1959 | 21/09/1959 | 14 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 07/12/1959 | 08/12/1959 | 2 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 13/02/1962 | 17/03/1962 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 24220 (Diagram 50A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
25/03/1962 | Darlington MPD (Ex-Works) | Ex-Works on 51A: D3072, D3874, D5108, 43055, 43101, 60835, 60939, 61019/39, 63388, 65794, 65889/92, 68011, 80116, 90072, 90342, 90503. Waiting works on 51A: 12115, 43070/5, 46494, 60811/44, 61237, 68754, 78015, 92098. | SLS/196205 |
25/04/1964 | Darlington Works (North Road Scrap Yard) | Erecting Shop: D12, D25, D28, D181, D186, Dep. 84, D2078, D2605, D3140, D3455, D3656, D5106, D5155, D7591 painted, D7593 motors mounted, D7594, D7595 equipment fitted, D7596 body, 60124, 60133, 61016, 61256, 61289, 61388, 62065, 62067, 65882, 73004, 73071, 75056, 90047. Stripping Shop (Inside): 61306, 43033; Stripping Shop (Outside): 60011, 60864. Paint Shop (Inside): D182; Paint Shop (Outside): 75006 painted green. Level Crossing: D30, D3378 ex works, D3675, D7592 painted. Works Yard: D2700, D5166, D7597 body, 60973, 63399, 62057 frame, 65033, 65099, 73142 ex works, 90370 ex works. Works Shunter: 68037. Test House: Empty. North Road Scrap Yard: 63388, 65876. Shed (Waiting Works): 60020, 65880, 69020 Stored, 61304, 61321, 68046, 68051, 68054. | SLS/196406 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1917 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2231 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Tyne Dock (TDK) Diagram 50 boiler fitted |
||
1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: ?/1922. Dep: ?/12/1922. Work undertaken: Boiler number D156 (Diagram 50) |
||
29/09/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1924. Dep: 03/12/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number D192 (Diagram 50) |
||
31/01/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) | ||
31/03/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
12/12/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 12/12/1927. Dep: 28/03/1928. | ||
09/02/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 09/02/1931. Dep: 17/03/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2384 (Diagram 50) |
||
20/03/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/03/1935. Dep: 01/05/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2652 (Diagram 50) |
||
19/01/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/01/1938. Dep: 25/03/1938. | ||
28/10/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
02/03/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK) | ||
13/03/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/03/1940. Dep: 29/03/1940. | ||
11/12/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/12/1940. Dep: 09/01/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3155 (Diagram 50A) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Borough Gardens (BOR) | ||
13/10/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1943. Dep: 03/02/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2989 (Diagram 50A) |
||
15/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3388 | ||
28/02/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/02/1947. Dep: 03/05/1947. | ||
06/05/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/05/1947. Dep: 31/05/1947. | ||
06/12/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/12/1948. Dep: 20/12/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63388 |
||
06/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
12/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
01/02/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/02/1950. Dep: 15/04/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24213 (Diagram 50A) |
||
23/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/11/1951. Dep: 20/12/1951. | ||
10/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 10/01/1953. Dep: 07/02/1953. | ||
10/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/02/1953. Dep: 17/02/1953. | ||
14/07/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/07/1955. Dep: 06/08/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24181 (Diagram 50A) |
||
08/08/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/08/1955. Dep: 09/08/1955. | ||
02/04/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/04/1958. Dep: 01/05/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24268 (Diagram 50A) |
||
13/05/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/05/1958. Dep: 20/05/1958. | ||
01/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) | ||
13/08/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/08/1959. Dep: 17/08/1959. | ||
08/09/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/09/1959. Dep: 21/09/1959. | ||
07/12/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/12/1959. Dep: 08/12/1959. | ||
13/02/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/02/1962. Dep: 17/03/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24220 (Diagram 50A) |
||
23/06/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Auckland (51F) | ||
06/10/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sunderland (52G) | ||
16/03/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63388 from Sunderland (52G) |