|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 15/03/1923 | 19/06/1923 | 97 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 04/09/1925 | 18/12/1925 | 106 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 26/09/1928 | 12/11/1928 | 48 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 29/10/1929 | 15/11/1929 | 18 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 17/06/1931 | 20/08/1931 | 65 days | General | Boiler number D1204 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/12/1935 | 18/01/1936 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 2783 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 19/01/1936 | 29/01/1936 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 18/08/1938 | 27/09/1938 | 41 days | Heavy | |||
Darlington Works | 08/11/1939 | 14/12/1939 | 37 days | General | Boiler number D1588 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/01/1941 | 24/02/1941 | 32 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 24/11/1941 | 11/12/1941 | 18 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 01/09/1942 | 01/10/1942 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 2558 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/01/1945 | 02/02/1945 | 31 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 17/05/1945 | 02/06/1945 | 17 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 18/07/1946 | 31/08/1946 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 2265 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/03/1947 | 05/07/1947 | 104 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 28/04/1950 | 27/05/1950 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 3424 (Diagram 49A) Renumbered to BR 63464 |
||
Darlington Works | 08/06/1950 | 14/06/1950 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 06/10/1953 | 31/10/1953 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 24000 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 05/08/1954 | 14/08/1954 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 16/09/1954 | 07/10/1954 | 22 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 09/08/1956 | 16/08/1956 | 8 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 24/04/1957 | 18/05/1957 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 24051 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/05/1957 | 21/05/1957 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 20/10/1960 | 24/11/1960 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 24042 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/01/1962 | 14/02/1962 | 29 days | Heavy Casual | Camplete AWS fitted |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
11/02/1962 | Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: D14/7/8/24/6, D3071/4, D4087-92, D5108/48/73-5, 12120, 60807/35/7, 60931, 61035, 61274, 63438/64/70/2, 65892, 67742, 80117, 90310, 90677/95, 92202, Weigh House: Nil. Outside Weigh House: 82027, Stripping Shop: 46407, 65751, 80116. Outside Stripping Shop: 46460, 61039, 61383, 67753, 68064, 68672. Works Yard: D281, D2173, D2589, 43016/53/5/71, 60954/9/77/81, 63412, 65099, 65794, 65889, 67609, 68010/43, 80119. 90603. Crossing: D257/78/80, D2247, D4086, D5107/49. Scrap Road: 61201, 61368, 61411-3/5/9/36/43/50/1/60, 64979, 65741/69, 65839, 67707/22/7/39/50/75, 68063, 68674/80/88/9/98, 68703/29/34. | SLS/196204 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
0000 | Modification | Diagram 49 number D1577 boiler fitted | ||
11/1919 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 905 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) Diagram 49 boiler fitted |
||
15/03/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/03/1923. Dep: 19/06/1923. | ||
04/09/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/09/1925. Dep: 18/12/1925. | ||
19/07/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haverton Hill (HAV) | ||
26/09/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 26/09/1928. Dep: 12/11/1928. | ||
29/10/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/10/1929. Dep: 15/11/1929. | ||
05/05/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stockton (SKN) | ||
17/06/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/06/1931. Dep: 20/08/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1204 (Diagram 49) |
||
13/08/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (SEL) | ||
02/12/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1935. Dep: 18/01/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2783 (Diagram 49) |
||
19/01/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/01/1936. Dep: 29/01/1936. | ||
18/08/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 18/08/1938. Dep: 27/09/1938. | ||
08/11/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/11/1939. Dep: 14/12/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1588 (Diagram 49) |
||
24/01/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/01/1941. Dep: 24/02/1941. | ||
24/11/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/11/1941. Dep: 11/12/1941. | ||
01/09/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/09/1942. Dep: 01/10/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2558 (Diagram 49) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK) | ||
03/01/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/01/1945. Dep: 02/02/1945. | ||
17/05/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/05/1945. Dep: 02/06/1945. | ||
07/07/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3464 | ||
18/07/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/07/1946. Dep: 31/08/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2265 (Diagram 49) |
||
24/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/03/1947. Dep: 05/07/1947. | ||
28/04/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/04/1950. Dep: 27/05/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3424 (Diagram 49A) Renumbered to BR 63464 |
||
08/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/06/1950. Dep: 14/06/1950. | ||
06/10/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/10/1953. Dep: 31/10/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24000 (Diagram 49A) |
||
05/08/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/08/1954. Dep: 14/08/1954. | ||
16/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/09/1954. Dep: 07/10/1954. | ||
17/06/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (52C) | ||
09/08/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/08/1956. Dep: 16/08/1956. | ||
24/04/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/04/1957. Dep: 18/05/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24051 (Diagram 49A) |
||
20/05/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/05/1957. Dep: 21/05/1957. | ||
25/01/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sunderland (52G) | ||
13/12/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (52H) | ||
20/10/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/10/1960. Dep: 24/11/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24042 (Diagram 49A) |
||
17/01/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 17/01/1962. Dep: 14/02/1962. Work undertaken: Camplete AWS fitted |
||
03/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63464 from Tyne Dock (52H) |