|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 04/1910 | General | |||||
Doncaster Works | 04/1910 | General | |||||
Doncaster Works | 1914 | 20/11/1914 | General | Boiler number 1544 (Diagram 4Sup) |
|||
Doncaster Works | 11/07/1923 | 13/10/1923 | 95 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (Tmp) number 409N |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/03/1926 | 26/06/1926 | 111 days | General | Boiler number 7835 (Diagram 4Sup) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3409 |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/12/1928 | 19/01/1929 | 43 days | General |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1902 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 409 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 970 Allocated to Colwick (CLK) Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted |
||
04/1910 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Dep: ?/04/1910. | ||
04/1910 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Dep: ?/04/1910. | ||
07/04/1910 | Modification | Diagram 4Sat number 1564 boiler fitted | ||
1914 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1914. Dep: 20/11/1914. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1544 (Diagram 4Sup) |
||
11/07/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/07/1923. Dep: 13/10/1923. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (Tmp) number 409N |
||
08/03/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1926. Dep: 26/06/1926. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7835 (Diagram 4Sup) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3409 |
||
08/12/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/12/1928. Dep: 19/01/1929. | ||
05/08/1931 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 3409 from Colwick (CLK) |