|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 02/1910 | General | |||||
Doncaster Works | 02/1910 | General | Rebuilt to class Q2 Boiler number 1546 (Diagram 4Sat) |
||||
Doncaster Works | 1912 | 12/06/1912 | General | Rebuilt to class Q2 Boiler number 7134 (Diagram 4Sup) |
|||
Doncaster Works | 18/07/1922 | 09/12/1922 | 145 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/02/1925 | 04/07/1925 | 149 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3410 |
||
Doncaster Works | 31/03/1927 | 31/08/1927 | 154 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/10/1929 | 02/11/1929 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/05/1932 | 11/06/1932 | 29 days | General |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/1902 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 410 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 971 Allocated to Colwick (CLK) Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted |
||
02/1910 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Dep: ?/02/1910. | ||
02/1910 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Dep: ?/02/1910. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class Q2 Boiler number 1546 (Diagram 4Sat) |
||
1912 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1912. Dep: 12/06/1912. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class Q2 Boiler number 7134 (Diagram 4Sup) |
||
18/07/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/07/1922. Dep: 09/12/1922. | ||
06/02/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1925. Dep: 04/07/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3410 |
||
31/03/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1927. Dep: 31/08/1927. | ||
05/10/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/10/1929. Dep: 02/11/1929. | ||
14/05/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/05/1932. Dep: 11/06/1932. | ||
10/08/1932 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
18/10/1935 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 3410 from Ardsley (ARD) |