Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 1034 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18837 Week
» 71853 Month
» 191380 Year
» 3218233 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
413 |
m/e |
09/1902 |
London and North Eastern Railway (Tmp) |
413N |
|
28/11/1923 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
3413 |
|
Not applied |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
Q1 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
231 |
Works Number |
982 |
To Service |
During 09/1902 to Ardsley (ARD) |
Withdrawal |
Mon 16/05/1927 off Ardsley (ARD) |
Service Life |
24 yrs, 8 mths , 15 dys |
Notes
Notes |
Cut up at Doncaster |
|
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
09/1902 |
Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted (number 1403) |
04/1914 |
Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted (number 1557) |
|
Works Visits
Works |
Stopped |
Entry |
Departure |
Duration |
Level of Work |
Actual |
Mileage |
Doncaster Works |
|
|
04/1914 |
|
General |
|
|
Doncaster Works |
|
26/07/1919 |
08/11/1919 |
106 days |
General |
|
|
Doncaster Works |
|
15/08/1923 |
28/11/1923 |
106 days |
General |
Renumbered to LNER (Tmp) number 413N
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1902 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 413 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 982 Allocated to Ardsley (ARD) Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted |
|
|
04/1914 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Dep: ?/04/1914. |
|
|
26/07/1919 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/07/1919. Dep: 08/11/1919. |
|
|
15/08/1923 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/08/1923. Dep: 28/11/1923. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (Tmp) number 413N
|
|
|
1924 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 3413 but not taken up |
|
|
16/05/1927 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 413 from Ardsley (ARD) |
|
|