|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 09/1909 | General | |||||
Doncaster Works | 09/1909 | General | |||||
Doncaster Works | 12/1913 | General | |||||
Doncaster Works | 12/1913 | General | 1546 ?/12/13 |
||||
Doncaster Works | 25/03/1922 | 26/08/1922 | 155 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/04/1925 | 18/07/1925 | 94 days | General | 1546 ?/12/13 Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3419 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/1903 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 419 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 987 Allocated to Ardsley (ARD) |
||
09/1909 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Dep: ?/09/1909. | ||
09/1909 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Dep: ?/09/1909. | ||
12/1913 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Dep: ?/12/1913. | ||
12/1913 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Dep: ?/12/1913. Work undertaken: 1546 ?/12/13 |
||
25/03/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/03/1922. Dep: 26/08/1922. | ||
16/04/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/04/1925. Dep: 18/07/1925. Work undertaken: 1546 ?/12/13 Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3419 |
||
13/09/1928 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 3419 from Ardsley (ARD) |