|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 12/1908 | General | |||||
Doncaster Works | 12/1908 | General | Rebuilt to class Q2 |
||||
Doncaster Works | 1915 | 23/12/1915 | General | Rebuilt to class Q2 Boiler number 1537 (Diagram 4Sup) |
|||
Doncaster Works | 13/02/1920 | 24/04/1920 | 72 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 31/07/1923 | 22/11/1923 | 115 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (Tmp) number 421N |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/03/1926 | 17/07/1926 | 118 days | General | Boiler number 7138 (Diagram 4Sup) |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/02/1929 | 16/03/1929 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/08/1931 | 19/09/1931 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 8175 (Diagram 4Sup) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/1903 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 421 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 989 Allocated to Colwick (CLK) Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted |
||
12/1908 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Dep: ?/12/1908. | ||
12/1908 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Dep: ?/12/1908. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class Q2 |
||
07/12/1908 | Modification | Diagram 4Sat number 1405 boiler fitted | ||
1915 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1915. Dep: 23/12/1915. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class Q2 Boiler number 1537 (Diagram 4Sup) |
||
13/02/1920 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/02/1920. Dep: 24/04/1920. | ||
31/07/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/07/1923. Dep: 22/11/1923. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (Tmp) number 421N |
||
15/04/1925 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3421 | ||
22/03/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1926. Dep: 17/07/1926. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7138 (Diagram 4Sup) |
||
09/02/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/02/1929. Dep: 16/03/1929. | ||
08/08/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/08/1931. Dep: 19/09/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8175 (Diagram 4Sup) |
||
19/05/1934 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 3421 from Colwick (CLK) |