Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1813 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15219 Week
» 68235 Month
» 187762 Year
» 3214615 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
431 |
m/e |
10/1903 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
3431 |
|
06/12/1924 |
Notes
Notes |
Cut up at Doncaster |
|
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
10/1903 |
Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted (number 1546) |
07/12/1909 |
Diagram 4Sup boiler fitted (number 1544) |
07/11/1913 |
Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted (number 1545) |
06/12/1924 |
Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted (number 1392) |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1903 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 431 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1016 Allocated to New England (NWE) Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted |
|
|
12/1909 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Dep: ?/12/1909. |
|
|
12/1909 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Dep: ?/12/1909. |
|
|
07/12/1909 |
Modification |
Diagram 4Sup number 1544 boiler fitted |
|
|
11/1913 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Dep: ?/11/1913. |
|
|
11/1913 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Dep: ?/11/1913. |
|
|
07/11/1913 |
Modification |
Diagram 4Sat number 1545 boiler fitted |
|
|
16/06/1922 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/06/1922. Dep: 21/10/1922. |
|
|
27/08/1924 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/08/1924. Dep: 06/12/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1392 (Diagram 4Sat) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3431
|
|
|
12/06/1928 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/06/1928. Dep: 03/08/1928. |
|
|
28/11/1931 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3431 from Ardsley (ARD) |
|
|