Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 1572 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19375 Week
» 72391 Month
» 191918 Year
» 3218771 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
1170 |
m/e |
12/1907 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
6170 |
m/e |
05/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9900 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
British Railways |
69900 |
m/e |
04/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Robinson |
Class |
S1 |
Company History |
GCR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-8-4T |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Order Number |
9655 |
Works Number |
5002 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
To Service |
During 12/1907 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 06/01/1956 |
Service Life |
48 yrs, 1 mth , 7 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1956 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1907 |
MEX |
|
Mexborough |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
36A |
|
Doncaster |
4w/e |
23/01/1954 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
06/01/1956 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
36A |
Doncaster |
4w/e |
23/01/1954 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
06/01/1956 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
11/1951 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/01/1956 |
York MPD |
December, 1955-January, 1956. On 28/12/55 60152 (64B), ex-works, was in York shed yard, and 60161 (64B) in similar circumstances on 5/1/56. 67764 (53B) was also at York on 28/12/55 en route for Darlington Works, whilst 67724 (30A) which had called at York, in rather poor condition, on 9/11/55, returned southward bound from Darlington Works on 12/1/56 in a more attractive state. On 29/12/55 new B.R. Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73106 from Doncaster was at York, with 76024 (52C) passing through for Doncaster Works. On the following day a very smart 60919 (61B) worked an up goods into Dringhouses during the course of running-in. from Darlington. On 4/1/56 44592 (5B) was an unusual visitor to York, whilst 63760 (54B) put in an appearance while on route for overhaul at Gorton. On the same day three very rusty and forlorn 'Sl' 0-8-4Ts were at York en route for scrapping at Darlington, namely 69900 (36A), 69902 (36B), 69904 (36B). 69900/04 were hauled in by 61188 (38A) in particularly smart trim. 69902 was still at York on the following day which was also marked by the unusual simultaneous appearance in York station of two 'B17s', 61626 (31A) and 61656 (32A); the former brought in the 7.20 a.m. Colchester to Newcastle train which has also recently produced Woodford V2s 60890 an 60915 instead of the more-usual Doncaster or March engine. On 12/1/56 unusual visitors were 43088 (35A), and from the L.M.R. 44692 (24A) and 45211 (25G). The beginning of the year saw the number of 'J25s' in store at York south shed reduced to two, i.e., 65675 an 65677, but the ex-L.M.S.. shed still contains 69864 (50G), 62702 (50A), 62746 (50D) and 62761 (50D) in store. 62730 (50A) is still dumped out of service in the north shed yard but 62345 is at last showing signs of awakening from her-very prolonged hibernation. |
SLS/195605 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1907 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 1170 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 5002 |
|
|
05/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 6170 |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9900 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Mexborough (MEX) |
|
|
04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69900 |
|
|
11/1951 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated boiler fitted |
|
|
23/01/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
06/01/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69900 |
|
|
02/1956 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|