|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 06/10/1937 | 08/10/1937 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 26/01/1938 | 16/03/1938 | 50 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 21/04/1938 | 23/04/1938 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 23/05/1938 | 24/05/1938 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 06/02/1939 | 18/04/1939 | 72 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 26/11/1939 | 30/11/1939 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 12/02/1940 | 19/02/1940 | 8 days | Unclassified | Pony truck exam |
||
Darlington Works | 01/03/1940 | 08/03/1940 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 27/01/1941 | 05/04/1941 | 69 days | General | Boiler number 29471 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/11/1943 | 04/12/1943 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 3054 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 17/11/1944 | 13/01/1945 | 58 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/10/1946 | 16/11/1946 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 9174 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/05/1948 | 05/06/1948 | 36 days | General | Renumbered to BR 60809 |
||
Gateshead Works | 25/10/1949 | 04/11/1949 | 11 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 17/04/1950 | 13/05/1950 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 2892 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 15/05/1950 | 23/05/1950 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 07/04/1952 | 08/05/1952 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 28529 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 29/01/1953 | 06/03/1953 | 37 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 30/12/1953 | 03/02/1954 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 29496 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 26/02/1954 | 27/02/1954 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 16/06/1955 | 25/07/1955 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 29468 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 22/03/1956 | 10/04/1956 | 20 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 07/12/1956 | 17/01/1957 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 29392 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/01/1957 | 06/02/1957 | 14 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 27/04/1958 | 29/04/1958 | 3 days | Unclassified | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 21/06/1958 | 26/06/1958 | 6 days | Unclassified | Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 02/10/1958 | 12/11/1958 | 42 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 15/11/1960 | 17/12/1960 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 29443 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/11/1961 | 16/01/1962 | 65 days | Heavy Casual | Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/03/1962 | 23/03/1962 | 11 days | Light Casual | After collision |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
14/01/1962 | Darlington Works (Works Yard) | Erecting Shop: D11, D256/71, D3316, D4083-8, D5107/8/49/72-5, 12119/20, 43053/7, 60812/98, 61275, 61388, 61454, 63381, 63467, 65768/72, 67638, 69005, 78026, 80118, 90397, 90620. Stripping Shop: 43071, 65892, 80117. Outside Stripping Shop: 60835, 61161, 92202. Works Yard: D18, D5096, 43055, 46450, 60809/22, 60963, 64897, 65099, 65862/9, 67681, 67718, 68017/43, 92064, 92199. Crossing: D17, D270/3, D2173, D2247/65, D3140, D4082, D5113. Scrap Road: 61411-3/5/9/36/43/50-2/9/60, 64979, 65741/69, 67707/13/22/39/50/72/5, 68688/9, 68729 all intact. | SLS/196203 |
20/09/1964 | Swindon Works (Scrap yard) | On the occasion of the Society farewell to the last G.W.R. County class tour, the following were on works:- Erecting Shop: D602, D806/19/37/43/9, D1001/6/9/14/15/28/32/43/58, D6335/57, D7009/73, 2210, 6862, 6951, 7803, 7924, 43001/137, 73034 an 92223. New Construction: D9512 complete and painted, D9513-6 almost complete, D9517-24 under construction. Top end of shop, PWM653, D3026/32/190/807/14/24. Weighing shed: D850, D1049, Outside in works yard: 4659, 8405/9, 8732, 9425/27, 42954/78, 43115/20, 60941/45, D1016/24, D6352, D7048, N.C.B. 0-6-2T (ex T.V.R.) and King 6000 (for movement to Stratford). Scrap yard: 2818, 5698, 6010, 6824/7/73, 7929, 8418, 9484, 60809/12/33/6/87, 60916/22/5/32/64/75, 43012/112. Stock shed: D3352, D6826, D9510/11. | SLS/196410 |
11/10/1964 | Swindon Works (C shop area) | Erecting shop: D602, D806/15/7/32/7/43/9, D1006/16/24/32/58/60/72, D3025/32/190/807/20/966, D6335/52/6, D7017/46/63, 2210, 6823/7, 6951, 7924/9, 42945/75, 43001/112/20/37, 73034, 92223, D9515/6 Painted, D9517-20 Cabs, D9521-7 Motors, D9528/9 Frames; PWM653; C shop area: NCB 67 (ex-TVR) and 6000 still awaiting movement to Stratford; 2818, 3748, 4626, 5264, 5602, 6010, 6824/73, 8401/18, 9484, 9752, 43003, 60809/12/56/87/916/22/32/41/5, 78009; Outside Erecting shop: 7803, 43012; Turntable area: D830/60, D1010/20, D3437, D7022/7/64, 4659, 8405/9, 9425, 9454, 42954; Stored Stock shed: 1010/2/4, 3702, 4569, 4916, 5963/75, 6804, 73012 | SLS/196411 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
31/08/1937 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4780 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1707 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
11/09/1937 | Naming | Named 'THE SNAPPER' | ||
06/10/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/10/1937. Dep: 08/10/1937. | ||
26/01/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/01/1938. Dep: 16/03/1938. | ||
21/04/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/04/1938. Dep: 23/04/1938. | ||
23/05/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/05/1938. Dep: 24/05/1938. | ||
06/02/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1939. Dep: 18/04/1939. | ||
26/11/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/11/1939. Dep: 30/11/1939. | ||
12/02/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/02/1940. Dep: 19/02/1940. Work undertaken: Pony truck exam |
||
01/03/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/03/1940. Dep: 08/03/1940. | ||
27/01/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/01/1941. Dep: 05/04/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29471 (Diagram 109) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
02/11/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1943. Dep: 04/12/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3054 (Diagram 109) |
||
17/11/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/11/1944. Dep: 13/01/1945. | ||
05/04/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 709 | ||
30/06/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 809 | ||
26/10/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/10/1946. Dep: 16/11/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9174 (Diagram 109) |
||
01/05/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/05/1948. Dep: 05/06/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 60809 |
||
06/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
12/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
25/10/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/10/1949. Dep: 04/11/1949. | ||
17/04/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/04/1950. Dep: 13/05/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2892 (Diagram 109) |
||
15/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/05/1950. Dep: 23/05/1950. | ||
01/07/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
07/07/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
07/04/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/04/1952. Dep: 08/05/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28529 (Diagram 109) |
||
29/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/01/1953. Dep: 06/03/1953. | ||
30/12/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/12/1953. Dep: 03/02/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29496 (Diagram 109) |
||
26/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/02/1954. Dep: 27/02/1954. | ||
16/06/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/06/1955. Dep: 25/07/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29468 (Diagram 109) |
||
22/03/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/03/1956. Dep: 10/04/1956. | ||
15/04/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
07/12/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/12/1956. Dep: 17/01/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29392 (Diagram 109) |
||
24/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/01/1957. Dep: 06/02/1957. | ||
16/06/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
27/04/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/04/1958. Dep: 29/04/1958. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
21/06/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/06/1958. Dep: 26/06/1958. Work undertaken: Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
02/10/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 02/10/1958. Dep: 12/11/1958. | ||
13/12/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
26/06/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (56C) | ||
11/09/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) | ||
15/11/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/11/1960. Dep: 17/12/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29443 (Diagram 109) |
||
11/06/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
13/11/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 13/11/1961. Dep: 16/01/1962. Work undertaken: Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
||
13/03/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 13/03/1962. Dep: 23/03/1962. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
06/07/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60809 from Darlington (51A) | ||
24/08/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |