|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 22/12/1937 | 06/01/1938 | 16 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 13/05/1939 | 13/05/1939 | 1 day | Unclassified | ARP |
||
Doncaster Works | 30/11/1939 | 20/01/1939 | -313 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/07/1940 | 10/08/1940 | 32 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/08/1941 | 04/10/1941 | 57 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/05/1943 | 10/06/1943 | 30 days | General | Darlington maintained from 1/8/43 |
||
Darlington Works | 07/09/1944 | 12/10/1944 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 29477 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 18/07/1945 | 04/09/1945 | 49 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 15/12/1945 | 29/12/1945 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 01/07/1946 | 17/08/1946 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 3373 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/01/1948 | 05/03/1948 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 3363 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E819 |
||
Darlington Works | 07/11/1949 | 08/12/1949 | 32 days | Heavy Casual | Renumbered to BR 60819 |
||
Darlington Works | 20/09/1950 | 21/10/1950 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 29451 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 19/12/1951 | 29/12/1951 | 11 days | Light Casual | Modified pony truck |
||
Darlington Works | 17/09/1952 | 18/10/1952 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 29511 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/10/1952 | 22/10/1952 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 30/10/1952 | 31/10/1952 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 17/09/1953 | 27/11/1953 | 72 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 15/12/1953 | 21/01/1954 | 38 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 13/12/1954 | 15/01/1955 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 29343 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/01/1955 | 18/01/1955 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 03/08/1956 | 07/09/1956 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 29512 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 31/03/1958 | 03/05/1958 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 28057 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 05/05/1958 | 06/05/1958 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 04/02/1960 | 03/03/1960 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 29423 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 01/04/1960 | 14/04/1960 | 14 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
07/02/1948 | Darlington Works | On 7/2 new 'L.1's' up to No. 9006 were complete and painted in North Road yard, Nos. 9001/2 are Darlington 2020/1 of 1948. Nos. 9001-3 are painted green and lettered L.N.E.R., while 9004 and upwards have 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' on the tank sides and the numbers on the bunkers; it is understood that they will be fitted with electric light and Westinghouse brakes. Nos. 9001/2 are at present working from Darlington on Saltburn turns. 'B.1' No. 1062 has been painted green and it is understood that 'B.1's' as they come in for shops will be dealt with in a similar manner. Locomotives awaiting Shops or scrapping during January included: 819, 958, 1881, 2111/2, 2361, 2713/8, 2939/41, 3124, 3252, 3339, 3404, 4756, 4860, 5030/44/98, 5639/45/46, 5769, 5804/31/49/78, 7266/74, 7608/43, 8308, 8402, 8725/27, 9379/86, 9422, 9775 an 9835, and Rail Cars Recovery and Hope. Locomotives ex Shops included: Nos. 1068, 1466, 2354/60/74/95, 3408/39/60, 5037, 5705/13/36/73, 7309/21, 7625/57, 8230/98, 8304, 8702/48, 9117, 9431, 9778/95/99, 9835/39/41/79/86/90. It is believed that the first two locomotives to be painted here with the words 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' and to have the number prefixed with an 'E' were Nos. E5696 and E5663, during W/E 31/1; all locomotives off North Road are now appearing in a similar manner. 'B.1's' Nos. 1273-6 have arrived at Bank Top shed, the first lot of a further ten to be allocated here; these will replace 'J.39's' which are going elsewhere | SLS/194803 |
05/05/1962 | Bathgate MPD | Stored are-60099/160. 60813/8/9/24/92. 60920/7/31/7/53/8, 62685. 64497, 64500, 65235/58/68/305, 67615/20, 68335/42/481, 69156/9/211/6. | SLS/196206 |
10/10/1963 | Inverurie Works (Scrap Yard) | 42737, 42909, 45475, 65918. In Scrap Yard: 60819/27, 64627, 65253/341. Shopped four weeks ended 4/10-44724, 45066, 80126, D6148/50, D8031; Scrapped same period-45049, 60851/959, 64568, 65316, 90193, 90536/42. | SLS/196311 |
02/11/1963 | Inverurie Works (Cut Up) | Shopped: 42737, 45475, D6149, D8030. Cut Up: 60819/27, 60937, 64627, 65253, 65341. Four weeks ending 30th November, 1963. Shopped: 42909, 44955, 65918, D6147/57. Cut Up: 57269, 57336, 57634, 60840/94, 64950, 64629. Four weeks ending 28th December, 1963. Shopped: 42919, 44703, D3930, D6140/42/45/52/54/55/56. Cut Up: 60898, 60972, 64557, 64600, 65900, 90019. Total for 1963: Steam-33 Shopped, 31 other repairs; Diesel-31 Shopped, 15 other repairs; Cut Up 86. Two weeks ending 10th January, 1964. Shopped: 61132, D6150. Cut Up: 60161, 64619. In Shops on 10th January: 44722, 64558/99, D368, D3935, D6139/51/53. Awaiting scrapping: 60089, 60159, 64579. | SLS/196402 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
15/11/1937 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4790 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1717 Allocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (ABD) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
22/12/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/12/1937. Dep: 06/01/1938. | ||
13/05/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/05/1939. Dep: 13/05/1939. Work undertaken: ARP |
||
30/11/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/11/1939. Dep: 20/01/1939. | ||
10/07/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/07/1940. Dep: 10/08/1940. | ||
09/08/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/08/1941. Dep: 04/10/1941. | ||
12/05/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/05/1943. Dep: 10/06/1943. Work undertaken: Darlington maintained from 1/8/43 |
||
07/09/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/09/1944. Dep: 12/10/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29477 (Diagram 109) |
||
18/07/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/07/1945. Dep: 04/09/1945. | ||
15/12/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/12/1945. Dep: 29/12/1945. | ||
30/03/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 719 | ||
02/06/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 819 | ||
01/07/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/07/1946. Dep: 17/08/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3373 (Diagram 109) |
||
24/01/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/01/1948. Dep: 05/03/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3363 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E819 |
||
07/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 07/11/1949. Dep: 08/12/1949. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 60819 |
||
20/09/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/09/1950. Dep: 21/10/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29451 (Diagram 109) |
||
19/12/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/12/1951. Dep: 29/12/1951. Work undertaken: Modified pony truck |
||
17/09/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/09/1952. Dep: 18/10/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29511 (Diagram 109) |
||
20/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/10/1952. Dep: 22/10/1952. | ||
30/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/10/1952. Dep: 31/10/1952. | ||
17/09/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 17/09/1953. Dep: 27/11/1953. | ||
15/12/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/12/1953. Dep: 21/01/1954. | ||
13/12/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/12/1954. Dep: 15/01/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29343 (Diagram 109) |
||
17/01/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/01/1955. Dep: 18/01/1955. | ||
03/08/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/08/1956. Dep: 07/09/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29512 (Diagram 109) |
||
31/03/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1958. Dep: 03/05/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28057 (Diagram 109) |
||
05/05/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/05/1958. Dep: 06/05/1958. | ||
01/01/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) | ||
10/11/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
04/02/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/02/1960. Dep: 03/03/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29423 (Diagram 109) |
||
01/04/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/04/1960. Dep: 14/04/1960. | ||
29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60819 from St Margarets (64A) | ||
29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 819 from St Margarets (64A) | ||
18/10/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Inverurie |