|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 30/06/1938 | 01/07/1938 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/03/1939 | 11/03/1939 | 5 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/05/1939 | 08/07/1939 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/02/1941 | 22/03/1941 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/03/1943 | 17/04/1943 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 2937 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/09/1943 | 02/10/1943 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/01/1945 | 17/02/1945 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/03/1947 | 03/05/1947 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 29518 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/05/1947 | 24/05/1947 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 30/03/1948 | 23/04/1948 | 25 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 60825 |
||
Darlington Works | 29/05/1948 | 23/06/1948 | 26 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 09/07/1948 | 27/07/1948 | 19 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 15/06/1949 | 09/08/1949 | 56 days | General | Boiler number 29497 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/07/1951 | 23/08/1951 | 44 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 19/05/1953 | 20/06/1953 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 29499 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 22/06/1953 | 25/06/1953 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 27/10/1953 | 17/11/1953 | 22 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 25/05/1955 | 25/06/1955 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 29483 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/06/1955 | 28/06/1955 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 07/05/1956 | 10/05/1956 | 4 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 05/03/1957 | 06/04/1957 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 28051 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/04/1957 | 10/04/1957 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 24/02/1959 | 31/03/1959 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 29419 (Diagram 109) Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
||
Cowlairs Works | 12/01/1960 | 23/01/1960 | 12 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 02/06/1960 | 12/07/1960 | 41 days | Heavy Casual | Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/12/1962 | 12/01/1963 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 28073 (Diagram 109) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/12/1942 | L.N.E.R. Notes (March Area) | March Area.-'V.2's' appear quite often, the following having been noted in Oct./Nov.: 4772/96, 4813/7. 'J.17' 8195 has been fitted with carriage heating and vacuum brake. 2859 East Anglian was here 31/10/42 fresh from Plant. It has ordinary whistle. A 'Pacific' visits us regularly on Sundays, examples noted being 4472/4 an 2571. 'E.4's' 7408/16/66/92 an 7503 are stationed here for working on the Joint line to Spalding, &c.-the first ones shedded here for a long time. Our regular station pilot 8062 is often in shops and its place is taken by 'D.16' 8805 or by 'D.9' or 'J.15' classes. | SLS/194302 |
30/04/1948 | Darlington Works | 'L.1's' Nos. 9000-9015 are to be renumbered 67701-67716. No. 67717 (9016) is the first to come out under this number, while No. 9015 was altered to 67716. The paint dates of Nos. 9009-9012 are March, and Nos. 9013-9015 and 67717-67718 are April. The Works' Nos. are 2028-2036/48 respectively. The next order for North Road will be a batch of 'A.1' 'Pacifics.' The rumour of further 'B.1's' came about owing to Stooperdale building a batch of spare boilers for this class. Locomotives for shops or scrap during the period April 4th-May 2nd included:-Nos. 1440, E1461, 2391, 2747, 3037, 3170, 3286, 3315, 5069, 5625, 5768/88, 7306, 7649/88, 9837/52, 9917/33, 77414, 79198. The following locomotives have arrived for cutting-up:-ex G.E. Nos. 5380/83, 5400, 7120/37, 8212, ex MET Nos. 7511/12 and ex M.G.N. No. 8485. Locomotives ex shops during the same period included Nos. 5778, 9856, 60510, 60825, 61011/60/71, 61420, 62388, 63125/40, 65624/50, 65825/47/51, 67263, 67301, 67632/84, 67718, 68248/90, 68724, 69786, 69875, 69910. The following locomotives have been painted or repainted green: Nos. 61011/60/71 an 67684. No. 60510 came off Works without nameplates, but returned and has at last had these fitted-Robert the Bruce. | SLS/194806 |
31/08/1948 | Darlington Works | Locomotives for shops during August included Nos. 507, 980, 2366, 3285, 3349, 3426/69, 5641, 5872, 7282, 7344, 7628, 8424, 8712/32, 9089, 9787, 62762, 67281 an 69798. Locomotives ex shops during the same period included Nos. 60509, 60824/25/98, 60920, 61455/61, 62706, 63361, 63418, 65647/69/92, 65708/37/41/62/63/67/89/99, 65809/16/62, 67295, 67605/16/30/78, 68305/37/60/93, 68423, 69781/82/95, 69868/73/84. No. 61461 has been rebuilt to 'B.16/3'; Paint date, August. Locomotives painted black and fully lined are Nos. 60898, 60920 an 62706, while No. 60509 has been painted green. The last 'L.1', No. 67730, is Darlington 2048 of 1948; Paint date, August | SLS/194810 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/01/1938 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4796 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1725 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
30/06/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/06/1938. Dep: 01/07/1938. | ||
07/03/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/03/1939. Dep: 11/03/1939. | ||
27/05/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/05/1939. Dep: 08/07/1939. | ||
22/02/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1941. Dep: 22/03/1941. | ||
13/03/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/03/1943. Dep: 17/04/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2937 (Diagram 109) |
||
18/09/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/09/1943. Dep: 02/10/1943. | ||
06/01/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/01/1945. Dep: 17/02/1945. | ||
13/10/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (STM) | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 725 but not taken up | ||
30/06/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 825 | ||
27/01/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (ABD) | ||
28/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/03/1947. Dep: 03/05/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29518 (Diagram 109) |
||
15/05/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/05/1947. Dep: 24/05/1947. | ||
30/03/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/03/1948. Dep: 23/04/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 60825 |
||
29/05/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/05/1948. Dep: 23/06/1948. | ||
09/07/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/07/1948. Dep: 27/07/1948. | ||
15/06/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/06/1949. Dep: 09/08/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29497 (Diagram 109) |
||
20/11/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
26/11/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (STM) | ||
11/07/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 11/07/1951. Dep: 23/08/1951. | ||
19/05/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/05/1953. Dep: 20/06/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29499 (Diagram 109) |
||
22/06/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/06/1953. Dep: 25/06/1953. | ||
27/10/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/10/1953. Dep: 17/11/1953. | ||
25/05/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/05/1955. Dep: 25/06/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29483 (Diagram 109) |
||
27/06/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/06/1955. Dep: 28/06/1955. | ||
07/05/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/05/1956. Dep: 10/05/1956. | ||
05/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/03/1957. Dep: 06/04/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28051 (Diagram 109) |
||
08/04/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/04/1957. Dep: 10/04/1957. | ||
24/02/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1959. Dep: 31/03/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29419 (Diagram 109) Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
||
12/01/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/01/1960. Dep: 23/01/1960. | ||
02/06/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 02/06/1960. Dep: 12/07/1960. Work undertaken: Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
||
11/12/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/12/1962. Dep: 12/01/1963. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28073 (Diagram 109) |
||
27/04/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60825 from Dundee Tay Bridge (62B) | ||
27/04/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B) | ||
09/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Cowlairs |