|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 12/05/1938 | 17/05/1938 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/03/1939 | 18/03/1939 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/07/1939 | 19/08/1939 | 48 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/09/1939 | 18/10/1939 | 26 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/06/1941 | 26/07/1941 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/05/1943 | 05/06/1943 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/01/1944 | 26/02/1944 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/10/1945 | 15/12/1945 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 2901 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/06/1947 | 19/07/1947 | 41 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/08/1949 | 03/10/1949 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 29376 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60828 |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/08/1951 | 25/09/1951 | 37 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/10/1953 | 20/11/1953 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 29364 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 25/05/1955 | 06/07/1955 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 29422 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 30/08/1955 | 18/10/1955 | 50 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 05/04/1957 | 08/05/1957 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 29394 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 22/04/1958 | 21/05/1958 | 30 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 23/09/1958 | 30/10/1958 | 38 days | Heavy Casual | Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
||
Darlington Works | 14/01/1959 | 26/01/1959 | 13 days | Unclassified | Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 21/04/1959 | 23/04/1959 | 3 days | Unclassified | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 05/01/1960 | 18/02/1960 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 28056 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/09/1961 | 14/09/1961 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 11/09/1962 | 20/10/1962 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 28050 (Diagram 109) Smith speedometer fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 23/11/1962 | 06/12/1962 | 14 days | Unclassified |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
28/03/1938 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4799 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1738 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
12/05/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/05/1938. Dep: 17/05/1938. | ||
06/09/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
11/03/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/03/1939. Dep: 18/03/1939. | ||
03/07/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/07/1939. Dep: 19/08/1939. | ||
23/09/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/09/1939. Dep: 18/10/1939. | ||
21/06/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/06/1941. Dep: 26/07/1941. | ||
08/05/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/05/1943. Dep: 05/06/1943. | ||
29/01/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/01/1944. Dep: 26/02/1944. | ||
25/11/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
27/10/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/10/1945. Dep: 15/12/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2901 (Diagram 109) |
||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 728 but not taken up | ||
13/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 828 | ||
23/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
09/06/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/06/1947. Dep: 19/07/1947. | ||
23/08/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/08/1949. Dep: 03/10/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29376 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60828 |
||
20/08/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 20/08/1951. Dep: 25/09/1951. | ||
20/10/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/10/1953. Dep: 20/11/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29364 (Diagram 109) |
||
20/06/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
25/05/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/05/1955. Dep: 06/07/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29422 (Diagram 109) |
||
10/07/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (34E) | ||
30/08/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 30/08/1955. Dep: 18/10/1955. | ||
02/10/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
05/04/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1957. Dep: 08/05/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29394 (Diagram 109) |
||
11/03/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (15E) | ||
22/04/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/04/1958. Dep: 21/05/1958. | ||
23/09/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 23/09/1958. Dep: 30/10/1958. Work undertaken: Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
||
02/11/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
14/01/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/01/1959. Dep: 26/01/1959. Work undertaken: Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
21/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/04/1959. Dep: 23/04/1959. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
05/01/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/01/1960. Dep: 18/02/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28056 (Diagram 109) |
||
11/09/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/09/1961. Dep: 14/09/1961. | ||
11/09/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/09/1962. Dep: 20/10/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28050 (Diagram 109) Smith speedometer fitted |
||
23/11/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/11/1962. Dep: 06/12/1962. | ||
04/10/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60828 from York (North) (50A) | ||
11/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |