|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 06/09/1938 | 09/09/1938 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 30/11/1938 | 06/12/1938 | 7 days | Unclassified | Alteration to tender |
||
Darlington Works | 06/09/1939 | 19/10/1939 | 44 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 14/09/1940 | 09/10/1940 | 26 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 04/09/1941 | 14/11/1941 | 72 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 19/11/1941 | 28/11/1941 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 05/11/1943 | 11/12/1943 | 37 days | General | MLS regulator off Boiler number 2896 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/03/1946 | 20/04/1946 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 29510 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to LNER (1946 1st) number 733 |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/10/1947 | 20/12/1947 | 64 days | General | Boiler number 29448 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 28/04/1948 | 28/04/1948 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/09/1949 | 15/10/1949 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 29494 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 22/05/1951 | 20/06/1951 | 30 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 10/02/1953 | 14/03/1953 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 29444 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 15/01/1955 | 17/02/1955 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 29450 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 29/10/1956 | 27/11/1956 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 29477 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 22/08/1958 | 24/09/1958 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 29420 (Diagram 109) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 19/02/1959 | 24/02/1959 | 6 days | Unclassified | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 06/01/1961 | 14/04/1961 | 99 days | General | Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
||
Darlington Works | 01/05/1961 | 03/05/1961 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 23/02/1962 | 20/03/1962 | 26 days | Heavy Casual | New left hand cylinder |
||
Darlington Works | 13/04/1962 | 04/05/1962 | 22 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 21/02/1963 | 04/03/1963 | 12 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 08/05/1963 | 08/05/1963 | 1 day | Weighing |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/12/1945 | Darlington Works | 2816 has the tender off C7 733 (tender No. 8648). It is expected that more conversions from B17 to B2 will follow soon. | SLS/194602 |
20/09/1964 | Swindon Works (Scrap yard) | On the occasion of the Society farewell to the last G.W.R. County class tour, the following were on works:- Erecting Shop: D602, D806/19/37/43/9, D1001/6/9/14/15/28/32/43/58, D6335/57, D7009/73, 2210, 6862, 6951, 7803, 7924, 43001/137, 73034 an 92223. New Construction: D9512 complete and painted, D9513-6 almost complete, D9517-24 under construction. Top end of shop, PWM653, D3026/32/190/807/14/24. Weighing shed: D850, D1049, Outside in works yard: 4659, 8405/9, 8732, 9425/27, 42954/78, 43115/20, 60941/45, D1016/24, D6352, D7048, N.C.B. 0-6-2T (ex T.V.R.) and King 6000 (for movement to Stratford). Scrap yard: 2818, 5698, 6010, 6824/7/73, 7929, 8418, 9484, 60809/12/33/6/87, 60916/22/5/32/64/75, 43012/112. Stock shed: D3352, D6826, D9510/11. | SLS/196410 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
31/08/1938 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4804 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1770 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
06/09/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/09/1938. Dep: 09/09/1938. | ||
27/09/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
30/11/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/11/1938. Dep: 06/12/1938. Work undertaken: Alteration to tender |
||
06/09/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/09/1939. Dep: 19/10/1939. | ||
14/09/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/09/1940. Dep: 09/10/1940. | ||
04/09/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/09/1941. Dep: 14/11/1941. | ||
19/11/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/11/1941. Dep: 28/11/1941. | ||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
05/11/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1943. Dep: 11/12/1943. Work undertaken: MLS regulator off Boiler number 2896 (Diagram 109) |
||
16/03/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/03/1946. Dep: 20/04/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29510 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to LNER (1946 1st) number 733 |
||
26/05/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 833 | ||
18/10/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1947. Dep: 20/12/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29448 (Diagram 109) |
||
28/04/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 28/04/1948. Dep: 28/04/1948. | ||
18/10/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 60833 | ||
06/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
12/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
13/09/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/09/1949. Dep: 15/10/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29494 (Diagram 109) |
||
22/05/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 22/05/1951. Dep: 20/06/1951. | ||
10/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/02/1953. Dep: 14/03/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29444 (Diagram 109) |
||
15/01/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1955. Dep: 17/02/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29450 (Diagram 109) |
||
29/05/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
29/10/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/10/1956. Dep: 27/11/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29477 (Diagram 109) |
||
22/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/08/1958. Dep: 24/09/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29420 (Diagram 109) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
19/02/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/02/1959. Dep: 24/02/1959. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
03/01/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
06/01/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/01/1961. Dep: 14/04/1961. Work undertaken: Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
||
01/05/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/05/1961. Dep: 03/05/1961. | ||
23/02/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 23/02/1962. Dep: 20/03/1962. Work undertaken: New left hand cylinder |
||
13/04/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/04/1962. Dep: 04/05/1962. | ||
02/12/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
21/02/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/02/1963. Dep: 04/03/1963. | ||
08/05/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 08/05/1963. Dep: 08/05/1963. | ||
25/05/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60833 from York (North) (50A) | ||
08/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |