|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 25/07/1939 | 27/07/1939 | 3 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/10/1940 | 23/11/1940 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/07/1942 | 29/08/1942 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/06/1944 | 22/07/1944 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 2924 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/04/1946 | 25/05/1946 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/11/1947 | 08/01/1948 | 42 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/05/1950 | 22/06/1950 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 29398 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60852 |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/02/1952 | 13/03/1952 | 33 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/12/1953 | 29/01/1954 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 29362 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/12/1955 | 08/02/1956 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 29487 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/11/1956 | 09/11/1956 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 27/06/1957 | 14/08/1957 | 49 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 28/04/1958 | 29/05/1958 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 29391 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/06/1958 | 30/06/1958 | 14 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 11/07/1958 | 18/08/1958 | 39 days | Unclassified | Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 06/04/1959 | 07/04/1959 | 2 days | Unclassified | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 15/01/1960 | 07/03/1960 | 53 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 01/05/1961 | 21/10/1961 | 174 days | Heavy Intermediate | Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
04/06/1961 | Darlington Works (Works Yard) | Erecting Shop: D272, D2243, D2700, D3456, D4071-5, D5098, D5157-61, 43085, 60816/23/57/8/97, 60900, 61028, 61206/69, 61303, 63468, 67620/91. 67733, 80100, 90124, 90465/70, 90518. Stripping Shop: 60974, 65868. 67636, 80099. Outside Stripping Shop: 43116, 61464, 63382, 63466. Works Yard: D4070, D5101, 60852/69/99, 60920/75/81, 61238, 63341/58, 63452, 65099, 65753, 65801, 67643/90, 68007/43/80, 92060, 92192. Crossing: D280, D3322, D5106/56. Scrap Yard: 61416/62, 68673 all intact. | SLS/196107 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
31/03/1939 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4823 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1793 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
25/07/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/07/1939. Dep: 27/07/1939. | ||
12/10/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/10/1940. Dep: 23/11/1940. | ||
25/07/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/07/1942. Dep: 29/08/1942. | ||
24/06/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/06/1944. Dep: 22/07/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2924 (Diagram 109) |
||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 752 but not taken up | ||
17/02/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP) | ||
07/03/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
13/04/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/04/1946. Dep: 25/05/1946. | ||
07/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 852 | ||
28/11/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/11/1947. Dep: 08/01/1948. | ||
15/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/05/1950. Dep: 22/06/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29398 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60852 |
||
10/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 10/02/1952. Dep: 13/03/1952. | ||
28/12/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/12/1953. Dep: 29/01/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29362 (Diagram 109) |
||
23/12/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/12/1955. Dep: 08/02/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29487 (Diagram 109) |
||
05/11/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/11/1956. Dep: 09/11/1956. | ||
27/06/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/06/1957. Dep: 14/08/1957. | ||
28/04/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/04/1958. Dep: 29/05/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29391 (Diagram 109) |
||
17/06/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/06/1958. Dep: 30/06/1958. | ||
11/07/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/07/1958. Dep: 18/08/1958. Work undertaken: Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
06/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/04/1959. Dep: 07/04/1959. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
15/01/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/01/1960. Dep: 07/03/1960. | ||
01/05/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 01/05/1961. Dep: 21/10/1961. Work undertaken: Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
||
22/09/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60852 from Doncaster (36A) | ||
13/11/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |