|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 16/08/1939 | 19/08/1939 | 4 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/10/1940 | 30/11/1940 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/11/1942 | 05/12/1942 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/08/1944 | 30/09/1944 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/02/1946 | 02/03/1946 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 31/08/1946 | 26/10/1946 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 29467 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 853 |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/11/1946 | 07/12/1946 | 20 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/02/1949 | 31/03/1949 | 49 days | General | Boiler number 3274 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60853 |
||
Doncaster Works | 04/03/1951 | 12/04/1951 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 29357 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/11/1951 | 27/12/1951 | 38 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/08/1952 | 03/10/1952 | 44 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/07/1954 | 18/08/1954 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 29396 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/09/1956 | 21/10/1956 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 29407 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/12/1956 | 22/12/1956 | 16 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 10/12/1958 | 16/01/1959 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 29545 (Diagram 109) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 07/05/1959 | 08/05/1959 | 2 days | Unclassified | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/01/1962 | 14/03/1962 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 29492 (Diagram 109) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
16/01/1943 | Doncaster Notes (engines lettered 'NE') | No. 2005, converted to Class 'A,' was due out 16/1. Another 'Q.4' 5048 is on hand for conversion to 'Q.1.' Other arrivals for works are 3838, 3465 an 4993. Streamlined 'B.17' 2870 has left works after a 'general,' also 'J.55' 3859 (BFD). Following on the previous list of engines lettered 'NE' at Plant:- October: 2957, 4474, 1125, 4513, 180, 4003, 4663, 4340, 3488, 4266, 2572, 4655, 3497, 1158, 1367, 4471, 1312, 4312, 3350, 4601, 1141, 4377, 2598, 4490, 2859, 2555, 2461, 483, 3076, 4637, 590, 2766, 4834, 4664, 1118, 4888, 2394, 3224, 4594, 4462, November: 3476, 2439, 4871, 4594, 4646, 4008, 2960, 601, 4053, 4805, 2426, 118, 135, 2563, 112, 1300, 4035, 4449, 4246, 4884, 2744, 4843, 3298, 2417, 5961, 178, 4495, 608, 2958, 2579, 2453, 3050, 125, 114, 4853, 3500, 3494, 2593, 3167. December: 3821, 4497, 4414, 4426, 3276, 4824, 586, 4545, 3621, 4018, 4225, 587, 3275 4793, 2546, 4456, 3819, 4851, 4316, 3631, 3819, 599, 3010, 3593, 17, 3387, 6139, 3498, 1156, 2870, 4240, 2955, 3232, 3047. | SLS/194302 |
28/01/1962 | Doncaster Works (Stripping Road) | New Erecting Shop: D5643, D8213, E3072-6. Stripping Road: D4055/63, 60129, 60853, 61285, 61315, 63630, 73036. Crimpsall: 60119, 63962. Outside Crimpsall: 60870, 60938, 61168, 62021/34. Scrap Road: 68900 intact, 61862, 61908 being cut up. Erecting Shop: D3482, D5525/95, D5642/57, 12126/33, 13288, 60043/61/78/83/97, 60107, 60817, 61252, 61374/5, 61899, 63571, 70003/7, 76021. Erecting Shop Yard: 60062, 60112. Boiler Park: 60014/47. Weigh House: D5547. Outside Weigh House: D3289, 61223, 63924, 68928, 70006. Paint Shop: D3336, D3487, D5371/2, D5822, E3070/1, 60087, 76046. Paint Shop Yard: Nil. Works Shunters: DEPT. 10/1. | SLS/196203 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/04/1939 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4824 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1794 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
16/08/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/08/1939. Dep: 19/08/1939. | ||
19/10/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/10/1940. Dep: 30/11/1940. | ||
07/11/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/11/1942. Dep: 05/12/1942. | ||
19/08/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/08/1944. Dep: 30/09/1944. | ||
22/01/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP) | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 753 but not taken up | ||
09/02/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/02/1946. Dep: 02/03/1946. | ||
31/08/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/08/1946. Dep: 26/10/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29467 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 853 |
||
18/11/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/11/1946. Dep: 07/12/1946. | ||
16/12/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
18/12/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
11/02/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/02/1949. Dep: 31/03/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3274 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60853 |
||
04/03/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/03/1951. Dep: 12/04/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29357 (Diagram 109) |
||
02/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (35A) | ||
08/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (35A) | ||
20/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 20/11/1951. Dep: 27/12/1951. | ||
21/08/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 21/08/1952. Dep: 03/10/1952. | ||
20/07/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/07/1954. Dep: 18/08/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29396 (Diagram 109) |
||
24/09/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/09/1956. Dep: 21/10/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29407 (Diagram 109) |
||
07/12/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/12/1956. Dep: 22/12/1956. | ||
10/12/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/12/1958. Dep: 16/01/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29545 (Diagram 109) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
07/05/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/05/1959. Dep: 08/05/1959. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
22/01/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/01/1962. Dep: 14/03/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29492 (Diagram 109) |
||
29/04/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
22/09/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60853 from Doncaster (36A) | ||
22/11/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |