|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 06/06/1939 | 13/06/1939 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 26/07/1939 | 28/07/1939 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 18/11/1940 | 27/12/1940 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 2898 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 30/12/1940 | 08/01/1941 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 06/06/1942 | 11/07/1942 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 2894 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/05/1944 | 08/07/1944 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 3472 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/06/1946 | 20/07/1946 | 36 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 860 |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/01/1948 | 28/02/1948 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 3461 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E860 |
||
Doncaster Works | 17/12/1948 | 08/01/1949 | 23 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/11/1949 | 24/12/1949 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 2897 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 12/10/1951 | 15/11/1951 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 29513 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/07/1952 | 16/09/1952 | 71 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/09/1952 | 04/10/1952 | 15 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 18/05/1954 | 18/06/1954 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 29471 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/08/1954 | 14/08/1954 | 5 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 11/10/1956 | 14/11/1956 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 29504 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/04/1958 | 02/04/1958 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 10/06/1958 | 20/06/1958 | 11 days | Unclassified | Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 26/09/1958 | 30/10/1958 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 29372 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 16/02/1959 | 19/02/1959 | 4 days | Unclassified | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 25/07/1960 | 31/08/1960 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 29462 (Diagram 109) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
26/05/1939 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4831 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1801 Allocated to Gateshead (GHD) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
06/06/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/06/1939. Dep: 13/06/1939. | ||
15/06/1939 | Naming | Named 'DURHAM SCHOOL' | ||
26/07/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/07/1939. Dep: 28/07/1939. | ||
30/09/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
18/11/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/11/1940. Dep: 27/12/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2898 (Diagram 109) |
||
30/12/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/12/1940. Dep: 08/01/1941. | ||
06/06/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1942. Dep: 11/07/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2894 (Diagram 109) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
18/05/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1944. Dep: 08/07/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3472 (Diagram 109) |
||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 760 but not taken up | ||
15/06/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/06/1946. Dep: 20/07/1946. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 860 |
||
28/01/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/01/1948. Dep: 28/02/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3461 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E860 |
||
12/11/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 60860 | ||
17/12/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/12/1948. Dep: 08/01/1949. | ||
06/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
12/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
21/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/11/1949. Dep: 24/12/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2897 (Diagram 109) |
||
01/07/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
07/07/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
09/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
15/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
12/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/10/1951. Dep: 15/11/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29513 (Diagram 109) |
||
08/07/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 08/07/1952. Dep: 16/09/1952. | ||
20/09/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/09/1952. Dep: 04/10/1952. | ||
12/04/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tweedmouth (52D) | ||
18/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1954. Dep: 18/06/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29471 (Diagram 109) |
||
10/08/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/08/1954. Dep: 14/08/1954. | ||
11/10/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/10/1956. Dep: 14/11/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29504 (Diagram 109) |
||
16/06/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
02/04/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 02/04/1958. Dep: 02/04/1958. | ||
10/06/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/06/1958. Dep: 20/06/1958. Work undertaken: Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
26/09/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/09/1958. Dep: 30/10/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29372 (Diagram 109) |
||
16/02/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/02/1959. Dep: 19/02/1959. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
03/01/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
25/07/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/07/1960. Dep: 31/08/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29462 (Diagram 109) |
||
22/10/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60860 from Heaton (52B) | ||
24/01/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |