|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 20/03/1940 | 05/04/1940 | 17 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 13/11/1940 | 18/12/1940 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 29379 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 18/01/1941 | 28/01/1941 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 01/12/1942 | 07/01/1943 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 2893 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/04/1944 | 29/04/1944 | 16 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 09/06/1944 | 08/07/1944 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 3302 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/12/1945 | 16/02/1946 | 69 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 26/10/1946 | 07/12/1946 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 2944 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 864 |
||
Darlington Works | 29/06/1950 | 17/08/1950 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 29527 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60864 |
||
Darlington Works | 04/01/1952 | 14/01/1952 | 11 days | Light Casual | Modified pony truck |
||
Darlington Works | 10/10/1952 | 08/11/1952 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 29452 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/09/1954 | 26/10/1954 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 28056 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 26/07/1955 | 25/10/1955 | 92 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 18/12/1956 | 25/01/1957 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 29467 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 29/12/1958 | 03/02/1959 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 29493 (Diagram 109) Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 11/10/1961 | 24/11/1961 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 29534 (Diagram 109) Smith speedometer fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 01/07/1963 | 30/07/1963 | 30 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
11/11/1961 | Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: D17, D249/51/79, D3317 D4079-81, D5102/49/68-73, 43141, 60859/64/91, 60952, 61020/4, 61129/92, 61218/89, 61382, 63405, 68025, 90067, 90333/44/63, 90445, 92194/5. Works Yard: D245/74, D2246, D3228, 12113, 46450/80, 60856, 60916/23/48, 61008, 61216/20/57, 63342/59, 63419/69, 65099, 65769, 65821/60, 67647, 67762, 68007/50, 69008, 78026, 80069, 90009, 90450, 92183. Stripping Shop: 61415/47. Outside Stripping Shop: 60939, 63435, 65691. Crossing: D272, D351 D3140, D4078, D5096, D5101/67, 60806. Scrap Yard: 61411-4/9/22/3/31/6/60, 65741, 67707/13/7/22/75/94, 68675/92, 68702 intact. | SLS/196201 |
25/04/1964 | Darlington Works (Stripping Shop Outside) | Erecting Shop: D12, D25, D28, D181, D186, Dep. 84, D2078, D2605, D3140, D3455, D3656, D5106, D5155, D7591 painted, D7593 motors mounted, D7594, D7595 equipment fitted, D7596 body, 60124, 60133, 61016, 61256, 61289, 61388, 62065, 62067, 65882, 73004, 73071, 75056, 90047. Stripping Shop (Inside): 61306, 43033; Stripping Shop (Outside): 60011, 60864. Paint Shop (Inside): D182; Paint Shop (Outside): 75006 painted green. Level Crossing: D30, D3378 ex works, D3675, D7592 painted. Works Yard: D2700, D5166, D7597 body, 60973, 63399, 62057 frame, 65033, 65099, 73142 ex works, 90370 ex works. Works Shunter: 68037. Test House: Empty. North Road Scrap Yard: 63388, 65876. Shed (Waiting Works): 60020, 65880, 69020 Stored, 61304, 61321, 68046, 68051, 68054. | SLS/196406 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
26/06/1939 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4835 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1805 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
20/03/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/03/1940. Dep: 05/04/1940. | ||
13/11/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/11/1940. Dep: 18/12/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29379 (Diagram 109) |
||
18/01/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/01/1941. Dep: 28/01/1941. | ||
01/12/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1942. Dep: 07/01/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2893 (Diagram 109) |
||
14/04/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/04/1944. Dep: 29/04/1944. | ||
09/06/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/06/1944. Dep: 08/07/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3302 (Diagram 109) |
||
24/11/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
10/12/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/12/1945. Dep: 16/02/1946. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 764 but not taken up | ||
26/10/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/10/1946. Dep: 07/12/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2944 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 864 |
||
12/12/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
18/12/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
29/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/06/1950. Dep: 17/08/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29527 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60864 |
||
04/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/01/1952. Dep: 14/01/1952. Work undertaken: Modified pony truck |
||
10/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/10/1952. Dep: 08/11/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29452 (Diagram 109) |
||
27/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/09/1954. Dep: 26/10/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28056 (Diagram 109) |
||
26/07/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 26/07/1955. Dep: 25/10/1955. | ||
18/12/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/12/1956. Dep: 25/01/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29467 (Diagram 109) |
||
29/12/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/12/1958. Dep: 03/02/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29493 (Diagram 109) Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
||
14/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (56C) | ||
01/11/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
11/10/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/10/1961. Dep: 24/11/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29534 (Diagram 109) Smith speedometer fitted |
||
01/07/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/07/1963. Dep: 30/07/1963. | ||
16/03/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60864 from York (North) (50A) | ||
09/04/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |