|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 14/11/1942 | 26/12/1942 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/10/1944 | 16/12/1944 | 50 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/08/1946 | 28/09/1946 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 2896 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/05/1948 | 10/06/1948 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 29415 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60880 |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/01/1950 | 06/04/1950 | 77 days | General | Boiler number 3020 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 27/01/1952 | 29/02/1952 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 29395 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/02/1954 | 10/03/1954 | 38 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/01/1956 | 25/02/1956 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 29383 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/02/1958 | 01/04/1958 | 41 days | Heavy Intermediate | Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 19/12/1958 | 14/01/1959 | 27 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 02/06/1959 | 04/06/1959 | 3 days | Unclassified | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 20/04/1960 | 17/05/1960 | 28 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 21/06/1961 | 10/08/1961 | 51 days | General | Boiler number 29403 (Diagram 109) Double blastpipe fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 16/08/1961 | 25/08/1961 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 30/08/1961 | 07/09/1961 | 9 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
16/01/1943 | Doncaster Notes (engines lettered 'NE') | No. 2005, converted to Class 'A,' was due out 16/1. Another 'Q.4' 5048 is on hand for conversion to 'Q.1.' Other arrivals for works are 3838, 3465 an 4993. Streamlined 'B.17' 2870 has left works after a 'general,' also 'J.55' 3859 (BFD). Following on the previous list of engines lettered 'NE' at Plant:- October: 2957, 4474, 1125, 4513, 180, 4003, 4663, 4340, 3488, 4266, 2572, 4655, 3497, 1158, 1367, 4471, 1312, 4312, 3350, 4601, 1141, 4377, 2598, 4490, 2859, 2555, 2461, 483, 3076, 4637, 590, 2766, 4834, 4664, 1118, 4888, 2394, 3224, 4594, 4462, November: 3476, 2439, 4871, 4594, 4646, 4008, 2960, 601, 4053, 4805, 2426, 118, 135, 2563, 112, 1300, 4035, 4449, 4246, 4884, 2744, 4843, 3298, 2417, 5961, 178, 4495, 608, 2958, 2579, 2453, 3050, 125, 114, 4853, 3500, 3494, 2593, 3167. December: 3821, 4497, 4414, 4426, 3276, 4824, 586, 4545, 3621, 4018, 4225, 587, 3275 4793, 2546, 4456, 3819, 4851, 4316, 3631, 3819, 599, 3010, 3593, 17, 3387, 6139, 3498, 1156, 2870, 4240, 2955, 3232, 3047. | SLS/194302 |
30/04/1950 | Doncaster Works | Class A.1 named include 60120 Kittiwake, 60133 Pommern, 60141 Abbotsford in, April; other engines through Doncaster Plant included A.1 60122; A.2 60500/12/39; A.3 60039/43/54/94; A.4 60018/20/1/3; V.2 60814/20/32/65/67/80/97, 60912/14; K.3 61802/22/24/46/61/67/77, 61947/69/85; B.17 61634; C.12 67366; K.5 61863 (light repair); B.1 61036/83/95, 61113, 61267. Some exchanges of 'Pacifics' and 'Green Arrows' are afoot on account of A.T.C. trials on the G.N. Section. | SLS/195006 |
09/07/1961 | Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: D242, D2243/6/8, D2700, D3456, D4073-6, D5160-4, 60803/80/99, 61322, 61457, 63354, 63401/65, 65825, 77012, 78022, 80075, 90061, 90405/26, 92197. Stripping Shop: 61437. Stripping Shop Yard: 60882, 60935/71, 63367, 63417/66, 65760, 77011. Works Yard: D239/78/80, D5158, 43051, 43126/33/4/41, 46480, 60802/55, 60903/63, 63441, 65099, 65761/90, 65820/84, 67643/58, 67760, 68040/7/50, 90089, 92175. Crossing: D13, D4072, D5159. Stooperdale: 90074. Scrap Yard, (i) Complete Locos: 61432/45, 67665, 67707/19/32/8/40, DEPT54. Scrap Yard, (ii) Parts of Locos: 61455, 68080, 68316, 69105, 69921. | SLS/196108 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/09/1940 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4851 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1917 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
14/11/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/11/1942. Dep: 26/12/1942. | ||
28/10/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1944. Dep: 16/12/1944. | ||
26/11/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP) | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 780 but not taken up | ||
28/05/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
24/08/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1946. Dep: 28/09/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2896 (Diagram 109) |
||
13/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 880 | ||
14/05/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/05/1948. Dep: 10/06/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29415 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60880 |
||
20/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/01/1950. Dep: 06/04/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3020 (Diagram 109) |
||
27/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/01/1952. Dep: 29/02/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29395 (Diagram 109) |
||
01/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/02/1954. Dep: 10/03/1954. | ||
23/01/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/01/1956. Dep: 25/02/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29383 (Diagram 109) |
||
20/02/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 20/02/1958. Dep: 01/04/1958. Work undertaken: Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
19/12/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/12/1958. Dep: 14/01/1959. | ||
02/06/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/06/1959. Dep: 04/06/1959. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
20/04/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/04/1960. Dep: 17/05/1960. | ||
21/06/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/06/1961. Dep: 10/08/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29403 (Diagram 109) Double blastpipe fitted |
||
16/08/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/08/1961. Dep: 25/08/1961. | ||
30/08/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/08/1961. Dep: 07/09/1961. | ||
17/09/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (34E) | ||
16/06/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
22/09/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60880 from Doncaster (36A) | ||
14/11/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |