|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 07/04/1941 | 10/05/1941 | 34 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 04/06/1942 | 04/06/1942 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/10/1942 | 28/11/1942 | 34 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/12/1942 | 08/01/1943 | 17 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 29/04/1943 | 13/05/1943 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 22/06/1944 | 04/08/1944 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 2944 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 31/01/1945 | 24/02/1945 | 25 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 23/06/1945 | 14/07/1945 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 14/07/1945 | 21/07/1945 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 27/12/1945 | 29/12/1945 | 3 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 15/07/1946 | 20/09/1946 | 68 days | General | Boiler number 2918 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 882 |
||
Darlington Works | 30/05/1947 | 11/07/1947 | 43 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 06/03/1948 | 23/04/1948 | 49 days | General | Boiler number 3373 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60882 |
||
Darlington Works | 14/08/1950 | 13/09/1950 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 29442 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 15/10/1951 | 26/10/1951 | 12 days | Light Casual | Modified pony truck |
||
Darlington Works | 08/08/1952 | 16/09/1952 | 40 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 23/09/1952 | 27/09/1952 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 12/08/1954 | 06/10/1954 | 56 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 28/04/1955 | 27/05/1955 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 29449 (Diagram 109) |
||
Gateshead Works | 14/12/1955 | 21/12/1955 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 21/03/1957 | 18/04/1957 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 29369 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/03/1959 | 14/04/1959 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 29396 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 28/04/1959 | 08/05/1959 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 26/02/1962 | 30/03/1962 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 29493 (Diagram 109) Smith speedometer fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 09/04/1962 | 17/04/1962 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 12/12/1962 | 08/01/1963 | 28 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
16/01/1943 | Doncaster Notes (engines lettered 'NE') | No. 2005, converted to Class 'A,' was due out 16/1. Another 'Q.4' 5048 is on hand for conversion to 'Q.1.' Other arrivals for works are 3838, 3465 an 4993. Streamlined 'B.17' 2870 has left works after a 'general,' also 'J.55' 3859 (BFD). Following on the previous list of engines lettered 'NE' at Plant:- October: 2957, 4474, 1125, 4513, 180, 4003, 4663, 4340, 3488, 4266, 2572, 4655, 3497, 1158, 1367, 4471, 1312, 4312, 3350, 4601, 1141, 4377, 2598, 4490, 2859, 2555, 2461, 483, 3076, 4637, 590, 2766, 4834, 4664, 1118, 4888, 2394, 3224, 4594, 4462, November: 3476, 2439, 4871, 4594, 4646, 4008, 2960, 601, 4053, 4805, 2426, 118, 135, 2563, 112, 1300, 4035, 4449, 4246, 4884, 2744, 4843, 3298, 2417, 5961, 178, 4495, 608, 2958, 2579, 2453, 3050, 125, 114, 4853, 3500, 3494, 2593, 3167. December: 3821, 4497, 4414, 4426, 3276, 4824, 586, 4545, 3621, 4018, 4225, 587, 3275 4793, 2546, 4456, 3819, 4851, 4316, 3631, 3819, 599, 3010, 3593, 17, 3387, 6139, 3498, 1156, 2870, 4240, 2955, 3232, 3047. | SLS/194302 |
09/07/1961 | Darlington Works (Stripping Shop Yard) | Erecting Shop: D242, D2243/6/8, D2700, D3456, D4073-6, D5160-4, 60803/80/99, 61322, 61457, 63354, 63401/65, 65825, 77012, 78022, 80075, 90061, 90405/26, 92197. Stripping Shop: 61437. Stripping Shop Yard: 60882, 60935/71, 63367, 63417/66, 65760, 77011. Works Yard: D239/78/80, D5158, 43051, 43126/33/4/41, 46480, 60802/55, 60903/63, 63441, 65099, 65761/90, 65820/84, 67643/58, 67760, 68040/7/50, 90089, 92175. Crossing: D13, D4072, D5159. Stooperdale: 90074. Scrap Yard, (i) Complete Locos: 61432/45, 67665, 67707/19/32/8/40, DEPT54. Scrap Yard, (ii) Parts of Locos: 61455, 68080, 68316, 69105, 69921. | SLS/196108 |
25/03/1962 | Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: D4094 (Complete), D4158-60 (Engines in), D4161-5 (Frames), D15/30, D248/56, D2265, D3071, D3138, D3943, 46450, 60882/5, 60901/57, 61240/88, 63399, 63420/48/63/71, 65099, 90351, 92144/98, 92201. Stripping Shop: 46476, 60804, 65763. Stripping Shop Yard: 43117, 61013, 61256, 63360, 63443, 67752, 90068/81. Works Yard: D2113, D4091/2, D5174, 43129, 46460/7, 60816/55. 60954, 67609/61, 68024/35/64, 90333, 92097, 92194, Crossing: D2164, D2230, D2589, D3229/43. Test House: D4093, D5175. Scrap Yard: 61411/2/3/5/9/22/43/50/1/60, 64979, 65741/51/69, 67707/39/50/3/75, 68063, 68680/8/9, 68703/29/34 all complete with 60960/77, 61368, 67665/81 partially cut up. | SLS/196205 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/10/1939 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4853 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1813 Allocated to Carlisle Canal (CAR) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
11/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (STM) | ||
07/04/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/04/1941. Dep: 10/05/1941. | ||
05/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY) | ||
04/06/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Weighing) - Arr: 04/06/1942. Dep: 04/06/1942. | ||
26/10/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/10/1942. Dep: 28/11/1942. | ||
23/12/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/12/1942. Dep: 08/01/1943. | ||
29/04/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/04/1943. Dep: 13/05/1943. | ||
22/06/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/06/1944. Dep: 04/08/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2944 (Diagram 109) |
||
31/01/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 31/01/1945. Dep: 24/02/1945. | ||
23/06/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/06/1945. Dep: 14/07/1945. | ||
14/07/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/07/1945. Dep: 21/07/1945. | ||
27/12/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/12/1945. Dep: 29/12/1945. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 782 but not taken up | ||
15/07/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/07/1946. Dep: 20/09/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2918 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 882 |
||
30/05/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/05/1947. Dep: 11/07/1947. | ||
06/03/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/03/1948. Dep: 23/04/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3373 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60882 |
||
14/08/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/08/1950. Dep: 13/09/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29442 (Diagram 109) |
||
11/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
31/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
15/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/10/1951. Dep: 26/10/1951. Work undertaken: Modified pony truck |
||
08/08/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 08/08/1952. Dep: 16/09/1952. | ||
23/09/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/09/1952. Dep: 27/09/1952. | ||
12/08/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/08/1954. Dep: 06/10/1954. | ||
28/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/04/1955. Dep: 27/05/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29449 (Diagram 109) |
||
14/12/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/12/1955. Dep: 21/12/1955. | ||
21/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/03/1957. Dep: 18/04/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29369 (Diagram 109) |
||
04/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/03/1959. Dep: 14/04/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29396 (Diagram 109) |
||
28/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/04/1959. Dep: 08/05/1959. | ||
26/02/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/02/1962. Dep: 30/03/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29493 (Diagram 109) Smith speedometer fitted |
||
09/04/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/04/1962. Dep: 17/04/1962. | ||
12/12/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/12/1962. Dep: 08/01/1963. | ||
13/07/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60882 from St Margarets (64A) | ||
02/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Cowlairs |