|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 01/07/1941 | 28/08/1941 | 59 days | General | Boiler number 29361 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/01/1943 | 05/02/1943 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 3018 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 23/04/1945 | 20/07/1945 | 89 days | General | Boiler number 2954 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 31/05/1947 | 05/07/1947 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 2998 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/06/1948 | 06/08/1948 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 29471 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60898 |
||
Darlington Works | 11/11/1949 | 17/12/1949 | 37 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 03/01/1951 | 01/02/1951 | 30 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 25/08/1952 | 19/09/1952 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 29447 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 21/06/1954 | 31/07/1954 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 29481 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/08/1954 | 05/08/1954 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Inverurie Works | 06/04/1955 | 07/04/1955 | 2 days | Unclassified | Left hand injector pad welded |
||
Darlington Works | 19/03/1956 | 23/04/1956 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 29539 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/10/1957 | 30/11/1957 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 29521 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/01/1958 | 09/01/1958 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 02/11/1959 | 04/12/1959 | 33 days | General | ATC fitted Boiler number 29468 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 28/12/1961 | 02/02/1962 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 29430 (Diagram 109) Smith speedometer fitted |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/07/1948 | Darlington Works | 'L.1's' are completed up to No. 67727 and the last three are almost finished. The paint dates of Nos. 67719-21 are May, Nos. 67722-26 June and No. 67727 July. The Works' Nos. are 2037-2045, in order. Frames are laid down for the first two 'Pacifics' and it is understood that at least twelve are expected to be completed by the end of the year. No. 7306 the first 'G.5' to be withdrawn is in the scrap yard, together with No. 5115. A start was made on cutting-up 'C.7's' Nos. 2973 an 2982 during W/E 3/7/48 and these will be followed by No. 2954. Further engines of this class have arrived in the Works' road at the shed, and it is expected they will all be scrapped, they are as follows:-Nos. 2975, 2981, 2983, 2988 an 2995. 'J.93' No. 8488 arrived on a truck and was cut-up W/E 29/5/48. Easingwold Rly. No. 2 is still in the Works' yard in a very forlorn condition. The North Sunderland Rly. diesel Lady Armstrong has also been there for a considerable time; No. 8089 is at present working on the N.S. Rly. The frames of two ex G.N.R. 'Atlantic's' (still complete with cylinders) have been shortened and are being used back to back as a boiler wagon. 'B.1' No. 61014 is ex works painted black and fully lined, but minus name plates-the name being chalked on one side of the smokebox. Other locomotives noted painted black and fully lined include Nos. 60834, 60942, 61019 an 62751. Locomotives ex works to July 3rd, include:-Nos. 60919, 61410, 62724, 63282/90, 63345, 65024/64, 65575, 65673, 65708/54/62/75, 65816/41, 67613/29, 68245, 68307/58/91, 68706/61, 69771/98, 69833/37, 69854/66 an 69917. Locomotives for works during the same period include:-Nos. 509, 824/98, 920, 1012/19, 2375/79, 2706/61/68, 3250/64, 5099, 5670/92, 5774, 7246/95, 7305/06, 7603/05/10/16/30/35/61/78/90, 8262/91, 8358/60/93, 8434, 9781/82, 9832/52/57/82/85/93 an 61420. |
SLS/194808 |
31/08/1948 | Darlington Works | Locomotives for shops during August included Nos. 507, 980, 2366, 3285, 3349, 3426/69, 5641, 5872, 7282, 7344, 7628, 8424, 8712/32, 9089, 9787, 62762, 67281 an 69798. Locomotives ex shops during the same period included Nos. 60509, 60824/25/98, 60920, 61455/61, 62706, 63361, 63418, 65647/69/92, 65708/37/41/62/63/67/89/99, 65809/16/62, 67295, 67605/16/30/78, 68305/37/60/93, 68423, 69781/82/95, 69868/73/84. No. 61461 has been rebuilt to 'B.16/3'; Paint date, August. Locomotives painted black and fully lined are Nos. 60898, 60920 an 62706, while No. 60509 has been painted green. The last 'L.1', No. 67730, is Darlington 2048 of 1948; Paint date, August | SLS/194810 |
14/01/1962 | Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: D11, D256/71, D3316, D4083-8, D5107/8/49/72-5, 12119/20, 43053/7, 60812/98, 61275, 61388, 61454, 63381, 63467, 65768/72, 67638, 69005, 78026, 80118, 90397, 90620. Stripping Shop: 43071, 65892, 80117. Outside Stripping Shop: 60835, 61161, 92202. Works Yard: D18, D5096, 43055, 46450, 60809/22, 60963, 64897, 65099, 65862/9, 67681, 67718, 68017/43, 92064, 92199. Crossing: D17, D270/3, D2173, D2247/65, D3140, D4082, D5113. Scrap Road: 61411-3/5/9/36/43/50-2/9/60, 64979, 65741/69, 67707/13/22/39/50/72/5, 68688/9, 68729 all intact. | SLS/196203 |
02/11/1963 | Inverurie Works (Cut Up) | Shopped: 42737, 45475, D6149, D8030. Cut Up: 60819/27, 60937, 64627, 65253, 65341. Four weeks ending 30th November, 1963. Shopped: 42909, 44955, 65918, D6147/57. Cut Up: 57269, 57336, 57634, 60840/94, 64950, 64629. Four weeks ending 28th December, 1963. Shopped: 42919, 44703, D3930, D6140/42/45/52/54/55/56. Cut Up: 60898, 60972, 64557, 64600, 65900, 90019. Total for 1963: Steam-33 Shopped, 31 other repairs; Diesel-31 Shopped, 15 other repairs; Cut Up 86. Two weeks ending 10th January, 1964. Shopped: 61132, D6150. Cut Up: 60161, 64619. In Shops on 10th January: 44722, 64558/99, D368, D3935, D6139/51/53. Awaiting scrapping: 60089, 60159, 64579. | SLS/196402 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
22/02/1940 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4869 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1829 Allocated to Heaton (HTN) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
01/07/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/07/1941. Dep: 28/08/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29361 (Diagram 109) |
||
02/01/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/01/1943. Dep: 05/02/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3018 (Diagram 109) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
23/04/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/04/1945. Dep: 20/07/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2954 (Diagram 109) |
||
13/10/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (ABD) | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 798 but not taken up | ||
07/07/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 898 | ||
31/05/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/05/1947. Dep: 05/07/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2998 (Diagram 109) |
||
11/06/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/06/1948. Dep: 06/08/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29471 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60898 |
||
11/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 11/11/1949. Dep: 17/12/1949. | ||
03/01/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 03/01/1951. Dep: 01/02/1951. | ||
25/08/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/08/1952. Dep: 19/09/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29447 (Diagram 109) |
||
21/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/06/1954. Dep: 31/07/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29481 (Diagram 109) |
||
02/08/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/08/1954. Dep: 05/08/1954. | ||
06/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/04/1955. Dep: 07/04/1955. Work undertaken: Left hand injector pad welded |
||
19/03/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/03/1956. Dep: 23/04/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29539 (Diagram 109) |
||
25/10/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/10/1957. Dep: 30/11/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29521 (Diagram 109) |
||
03/01/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/01/1958. Dep: 09/01/1958. | ||
02/11/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1959. Dep: 04/12/1959. Work undertaken: ATC fitted Boiler number 29468 (Diagram 109) |
||
28/12/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/12/1961. Dep: 02/02/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29430 (Diagram 109) Smith speedometer fitted |
||
28/11/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60898 from Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) | ||
13/12/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Inverurie |