|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 25/04/1942 | 23/05/1942 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/03/1944 | 15/04/1944 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/06/1944 | 10/06/1944 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/04/1945 | 01/09/1945 | 134 days | General | Boiler being repaired at Darlington Boiler number 2910 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 31/08/1946 | 12/10/1946 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 3151 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 06/10/1948 | 23/11/1948 | 49 days | General | Boiler number 29348 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60908 |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/12/1950 | 17/01/1951 | 39 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/03/1952 | 31/03/1952 | 12 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/12/1952 | 14/01/1953 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 29356 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/01/1955 | 18/02/1955 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 29425 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 31/03/1957 | 17/05/1957 | 48 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 21/05/1957 | 24/05/1957 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 29/05/1957 | 04/06/1957 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 14/06/1957 | 20/06/1957 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 21/06/1957 | 02/07/1957 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 28/07/1959 | 02/09/1959 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 29344 (Diagram 109) Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
29/04/1940 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4879 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1839 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
25/04/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1942. Dep: 23/05/1942. | ||
11/03/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1944. Dep: 15/04/1944. | ||
03/06/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/06/1944. Dep: 10/06/1944. | ||
29/10/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
21/04/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/04/1945. Dep: 01/09/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler being repaired at Darlington Boiler number 2910 (Diagram 109) |
||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 808 but not taken up | ||
31/08/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/08/1946. Dep: 12/10/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3151 (Diagram 109) |
||
20/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 908 | ||
14/11/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
06/10/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/10/1948. Dep: 23/11/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29348 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60908 |
||
10/12/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 10/12/1950. Dep: 17/01/1951. | ||
20/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/03/1952. Dep: 31/03/1952. | ||
12/12/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/12/1952. Dep: 14/01/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29356 (Diagram 109) |
||
14/05/1953 | Allocation | Loaned to Nine Elms (70A) | ||
28/06/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (35A) | ||
19/01/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/01/1955. Dep: 18/02/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29425 (Diagram 109) |
||
31/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 31/03/1957. Dep: 17/05/1957. | ||
21/05/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/05/1957. Dep: 24/05/1957. | ||
29/05/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/05/1957. Dep: 04/06/1957. | ||
14/06/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/06/1957. Dep: 20/06/1957. | ||
21/06/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/06/1957. Dep: 02/07/1957. | ||
14/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (34F) | ||
28/07/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/07/1959. Dep: 02/09/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29344 (Diagram 109) Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
||
13/09/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
04/06/1962 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster | ||
04/06/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60908 from Doncaster (36A) |