|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 20/07/1940 | 03/08/1940 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/02/1942 | 04/04/1942 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/02/1944 | 11/03/1944 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/05/1945 | 02/06/1945 | 29 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/02/1946 | 23/03/1946 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/05/1947 | 18/06/1947 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 29472 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 25/04/1949 | 30/05/1949 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 3336 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60915 |
||
Doncaster Works | 06/01/1951 | 28/01/1951 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 29432 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/02/1952 | 18/02/1952 | 17 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/04/1952 | 25/04/1952 | 22 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/06/1953 | 28/07/1953 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 29434 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/08/1953 | 24/08/1953 | 13 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/10/1955 | 14/11/1955 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 29363 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/08/1957 | 26/09/1957 | 45 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 29/07/1959 | 11/09/1959 | 45 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 29/03/1960 | 06/05/1960 | 39 days | General | ATC fitted Boiler number 28054 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/11/1961 | 20/11/1961 | 12 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/01/1956 | York MPD (York station) | December, 1955-January, 1956. On 28/12/55 60152 (64B), ex-works, was in York shed yard, and 60161 (64B) in similar circumstances on 5/1/56. 67764 (53B) was also at York on 28/12/55 en route for Darlington Works, whilst 67724 (30A) which had called at York, in rather poor condition, on 9/11/55, returned southward bound from Darlington Works on 12/1/56 in a more attractive state. On 29/12/55 new B.R. Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73106 from Doncaster was at York, with 76024 (52C) passing through for Doncaster Works. On the following day a very smart 60919 (61B) worked an up goods into Dringhouses during the course of running-in. from Darlington. On 4/1/56 44592 (5B) was an unusual visitor to York, whilst 63760 (54B) put in an appearance while on route for overhaul at Gorton. On the same day three very rusty and forlorn 'Sl' 0-8-4Ts were at York en route for scrapping at Darlington, namely 69900 (36A), 69902 (36B), 69904 (36B). 69900/04 were hauled in by 61188 (38A) in particularly smart trim. 69902 was still at York on the following day which was also marked by the unusual simultaneous appearance in York station of two 'B17s', 61626 (31A) and 61656 (32A); the former brought in the 7.20 a.m. Colchester to Newcastle train which has also recently produced Woodford V2s 60890 an 60915 instead of the more-usual Doncaster or March engine. On 12/1/56 unusual visitors were 43088 (35A), and from the L.M.R. 44692 (24A) and 45211 (25G). The beginning of the year saw the number of 'J25s' in store at York south shed reduced to two, i.e., 65675 an 65677, but the ex-L.M.S.. shed still contains 69864 (50G), 62702 (50A), 62746 (50D) and 62761 (50D) in store. 62730 (50A) is still dumped out of service in the north shed yard but 62345 is at last showing signs of awakening from her-very prolonged hibernation. |
SLS/195605 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
15/06/1940 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4886 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1846 Allocated to New England (NWE) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
20/07/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/07/1940. Dep: 03/08/1940. | ||
21/02/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1942. Dep: 04/04/1942. | ||
12/02/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/02/1944. Dep: 11/03/1944. | ||
12/11/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
05/05/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/05/1945. Dep: 02/06/1945. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 815 but not taken up | ||
23/02/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1946. Dep: 23/03/1946. | ||
05/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 915 | ||
20/05/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/05/1947. Dep: 18/06/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29472 (Diagram 109) |
||
25/04/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1949. Dep: 30/05/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3336 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60915 |
||
06/01/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/01/1951. Dep: 28/01/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29432 (Diagram 109) |
||
28/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E) | ||
31/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E) | ||
02/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/02/1952. Dep: 18/02/1952. | ||
04/04/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/04/1952. Dep: 25/04/1952. | ||
18/06/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/06/1953. Dep: 28/07/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29434 (Diagram 109) |
||
12/08/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/08/1953. Dep: 24/08/1953. | ||
05/10/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/10/1955. Dep: 14/11/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29363 (Diagram 109) |
||
10/06/1957 | Report | Report: An excursion from Leicester brought "V2" No. 60915 (38A) to Saltburn on June 10. (Trains Illustrated - August, 1957) | ||
13/08/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 13/08/1957. Dep: 26/09/1957. | ||
25/07/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (15E) | ||
29/07/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/07/1959. Dep: 11/09/1959. | ||
06/09/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) | ||
29/03/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1960. Dep: 06/05/1960. Work undertaken: ATC fitted Boiler number 28054 (Diagram 109) |
||
09/11/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/11/1961. Dep: 20/11/1961. | ||
01/07/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
26/11/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60915 from Darlington (51A) | ||
14/12/1962 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |