|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 21/04/1942 | 06/05/1942 | 16 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 09/06/1943 | 15/07/1943 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 29495 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/03/1945 | 21/04/1945 | 43 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 11/01/1947 | 08/03/1947 | 57 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 16/04/1948 | 14/05/1948 | 29 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 09/09/1948 | 01/10/1948 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 3003 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60919 |
||
Darlington Works | 04/10/1948 | 14/10/1948 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 15/08/1949 | 19/10/1949 | 66 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 09/10/1950 | 09/11/1950 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 29445 (Diagram 109) |
||
Inverurie Works | 17/04/1951 | 19/04/1951 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 09/10/1952 | 01/11/1952 | 24 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 13/11/1952 | 16/11/1952 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 28/04/1954 | 26/05/1954 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 29528 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 12/11/1955 | 17/12/1955 | 36 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 19/12/1955 | 20/12/1955 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 01/07/1957 | 16/08/1957 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 29466 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 29/04/1959 | 04/06/1959 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 29525 (Diagram 109) Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 01/12/1960 | 13/01/1961 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 29350 (Diagram 109) Smith speedometer fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 18/06/1963 | 14/08/1963 | 58 days | General | Boiler number 29476 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 26/09/1963 | 19/10/1963 | 24 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 06/07/1965 | 20/08/1965 | 46 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/07/1948 | Darlington Works | 'L.1's' are completed up to No. 67727 and the last three are almost finished. The paint dates of Nos. 67719-21 are May, Nos. 67722-26 June and No. 67727 July. The Works' Nos. are 2037-2045, in order. Frames are laid down for the first two 'Pacifics' and it is understood that at least twelve are expected to be completed by the end of the year. No. 7306 the first 'G.5' to be withdrawn is in the scrap yard, together with No. 5115. A start was made on cutting-up 'C.7's' Nos. 2973 an 2982 during W/E 3/7/48 and these will be followed by No. 2954. Further engines of this class have arrived in the Works' road at the shed, and it is expected they will all be scrapped, they are as follows:-Nos. 2975, 2981, 2983, 2988 an 2995. 'J.93' No. 8488 arrived on a truck and was cut-up W/E 29/5/48. Easingwold Rly. No. 2 is still in the Works' yard in a very forlorn condition. The North Sunderland Rly. diesel Lady Armstrong has also been there for a considerable time; No. 8089 is at present working on the N.S. Rly. The frames of two ex G.N.R. 'Atlantic's' (still complete with cylinders) have been shortened and are being used back to back as a boiler wagon. 'B.1' No. 61014 is ex works painted black and fully lined, but minus name plates-the name being chalked on one side of the smokebox. Other locomotives noted painted black and fully lined include Nos. 60834, 60942, 61019 an 62751. Locomotives ex works to July 3rd, include:-Nos. 60919, 61410, 62724, 63282/90, 63345, 65024/64, 65575, 65673, 65708/54/62/75, 65816/41, 67613/29, 68245, 68307/58/91, 68706/61, 69771/98, 69833/37, 69854/66 an 69917. Locomotives for works during the same period include:-Nos. 509, 824/98, 920, 1012/19, 2375/79, 2706/61/68, 3250/64, 5099, 5670/92, 5774, 7246/95, 7305/06, 7603/05/10/16/30/35/61/78/90, 8262/91, 8358/60/93, 8434, 9781/82, 9832/52/57/82/85/93 an 61420. |
SLS/194808 |
31/01/1956 | York MPD | December, 1955-January, 1956. On 28/12/55 60152 (64B), ex-works, was in York shed yard, and 60161 (64B) in similar circumstances on 5/1/56. 67764 (53B) was also at York on 28/12/55 en route for Darlington Works, whilst 67724 (30A) which had called at York, in rather poor condition, on 9/11/55, returned southward bound from Darlington Works on 12/1/56 in a more attractive state. On 29/12/55 new B.R. Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73106 from Doncaster was at York, with 76024 (52C) passing through for Doncaster Works. On the following day a very smart 60919 (61B) worked an up goods into Dringhouses during the course of running-in. from Darlington. On 4/1/56 44592 (5B) was an unusual visitor to York, whilst 63760 (54B) put in an appearance while on route for overhaul at Gorton. On the same day three very rusty and forlorn 'Sl' 0-8-4Ts were at York en route for scrapping at Darlington, namely 69900 (36A), 69902 (36B), 69904 (36B). 69900/04 were hauled in by 61188 (38A) in particularly smart trim. 69902 was still at York on the following day which was also marked by the unusual simultaneous appearance in York station of two 'B17s', 61626 (31A) and 61656 (32A); the former brought in the 7.20 a.m. Colchester to Newcastle train which has also recently produced Woodford V2s 60890 an 60915 instead of the more-usual Doncaster or March engine. On 12/1/56 unusual visitors were 43088 (35A), and from the L.M.R. 44692 (24A) and 45211 (25G). The beginning of the year saw the number of 'J25s' in store at York south shed reduced to two, i.e., 65675 an 65677, but the ex-L.M.S.. shed still contains 69864 (50G), 62702 (50A), 62746 (50D) and 62761 (50D) in store. 62730 (50A) is still dumped out of service in the north shed yard but 62345 is at last showing signs of awakening from her-very prolonged hibernation. |
SLS/195605 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/09/1941 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4890 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1868 Allocated to Heaton (HTN) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
21/04/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/04/1942. Dep: 06/05/1942. | ||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
09/06/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/06/1943. Dep: 15/07/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29495 (Diagram 109) |
||
14/02/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tweedmouth (TWD) | ||
24/04/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
10/03/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/03/1945. Dep: 21/04/1945. | ||
13/10/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (ABD) | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 819 but not taken up | ||
22/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 919 | ||
11/01/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1947. Dep: 08/03/1947. | ||
16/04/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/04/1948. Dep: 14/05/1948. | ||
09/09/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/09/1948. Dep: 01/10/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3003 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60919 |
||
04/10/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/10/1948. Dep: 14/10/1948. | ||
15/08/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/08/1949. Dep: 19/10/1949. | ||
09/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/10/1950. Dep: 09/11/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29445 (Diagram 109) |
||
17/04/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/04/1951. Dep: 19/04/1951. | ||
09/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 09/10/1952. Dep: 01/11/1952. | ||
13/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/11/1952. Dep: 16/11/1952. | ||
28/04/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/04/1954. Dep: 26/05/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29528 (Diagram 109) |
||
12/11/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 12/11/1955. Dep: 17/12/1955. | ||
19/12/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/12/1955. Dep: 20/12/1955. | ||
01/07/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/07/1957. Dep: 16/08/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29466 (Diagram 109) |
||
29/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/04/1959. Dep: 04/06/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29525 (Diagram 109) Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
||
01/12/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1960. Dep: 13/01/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29350 (Diagram 109) Smith speedometer fitted |
||
18/06/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/06/1963. Dep: 14/08/1963. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29476 (Diagram 109) |
||
26/09/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/09/1963. Dep: 19/10/1963. | ||
11/05/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B) | ||
06/07/1965 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/07/1965. Dep: 20/08/1965. | ||
02/09/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60919 from Dundee Tay Bridge (62B) | ||
10/1966 | Scrapped | Broken up by Arnott Young: Old Kilpatrick |