|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 20/11/1943 | 25/12/1943 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/12/1946 | 19/01/1946 | -322 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/10/1947 | 15/11/1947 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 29376 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 25/07/1949 | 17/09/1949 | 55 days | General | Boiler number 29499 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/09/1949 | 01/10/1949 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 14/06/1951 | 14/07/1951 | 31 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 16/07/1951 | 17/07/1951 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 13/04/1953 | 16/05/1953 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 29449 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 18/05/1953 | 27/05/1953 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 27/01/1955 | 25/02/1955 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 28052 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/03/1955 | 16/03/1955 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 03/10/1955 | 11/10/1955 | 9 days | Light Casual | |||
Gateshead Works | 12/12/1955 | 18/01/1956 | 38 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 04/01/1957 | 10/01/1957 | 7 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 24/04/1957 | 18/05/1957 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 29352 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 26/08/1958 | 29/08/1958 | 4 days | Unclassified | Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 20/04/1959 | 24/04/1959 | 5 days | Unclassified | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 01/07/1959 | 22/08/1959 | 53 days | General | Boiler number 29461 (Diagram 109) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
17/12/1941 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4897 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1875 Allocated to Gateshead (GHD) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
20/11/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/11/1943. Dep: 25/12/1943. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 826 but not taken up | ||
17/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 926 | ||
08/12/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/12/1946. Dep: 19/01/1946. | ||
02/10/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/10/1947. Dep: 15/11/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29376 (Diagram 109) |
||
14/02/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 60926 | ||
25/07/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/07/1949. Dep: 17/09/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29499 (Diagram 109) |
||
21/09/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/09/1949. Dep: 01/10/1949. | ||
19/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
30/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
14/06/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 14/06/1951. Dep: 14/07/1951. | ||
16/07/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/07/1951. Dep: 17/07/1951. | ||
30/11/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tweedmouth (52D) | ||
27/12/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tweedmouth (52D) | ||
13/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/04/1953. Dep: 16/05/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29449 (Diagram 109) |
||
18/05/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/05/1953. Dep: 27/05/1953. | ||
27/01/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/01/1955. Dep: 25/02/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28052 (Diagram 109) |
||
10/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/03/1955. Dep: 16/03/1955. | ||
03/10/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/10/1955. Dep: 11/10/1955. | ||
12/12/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/12/1955. Dep: 18/01/1956. | ||
04/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/01/1957. Dep: 10/01/1957. | ||
24/04/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/04/1957. Dep: 18/05/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29352 (Diagram 109) |
||
26/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/08/1958. Dep: 29/08/1958. Work undertaken: Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
20/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/04/1959. Dep: 24/04/1959. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
01/07/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/07/1959. Dep: 22/08/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29461 (Diagram 109) |
||
01/10/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60926 from Tweedmouth (52D) | ||
25/01/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |