|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 07/01/1943 | 08/02/1943 | 33 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 15/07/1943 | 30/08/1943 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 29356 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 25/08/1945 | 29/09/1945 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/04/1947 | 10/05/1947 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 2928 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/11/1948 | 31/12/1948 | 51 days | General | Boiler number 2954 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/01/1949 | 13/01/1949 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 18/01/1949 | 28/01/1949 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 09/03/1950 | 27/03/1950 | 19 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 10/08/1950 | 08/09/1950 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 29441 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/11/1951 | 14/11/1951 | 12 days | Light Casual | Modified pony truck |
||
Darlington Works | 17/06/1952 | 12/07/1952 | 26 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 14/07/1952 | 15/07/1952 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 02/01/1953 | 22/01/1953 | 21 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 07/10/1954 | 06/11/1954 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 29408 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/11/1954 | 09/11/1954 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 25/10/1955 | 19/11/1955 | 26 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 05/11/1956 | 14/12/1956 | 40 days | Heavy Intermediate | Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/12/1956 | 19/12/1956 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 24/12/1956 | 29/12/1956 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 25/08/1958 | 26/09/1958 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 29491 (Diagram 109) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 26/02/1959 | 02/03/1959 | 5 days | Unclassified | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 16/11/1959 | 30/12/1959 | 45 days | Heavy Casual | After collision |
||
Darlington Works | 06/06/1961 | 08/07/1961 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 29541 (Diagram 109) Smith speedometer fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 28/07/1961 | 18/08/1961 | 22 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
10/05/1947 | Doncaster Works | Locos. ex Plant, end April-May were: Nos. 16, 41, 51, 63, 86, 90, 101, 102, 113, 521, 863, 878, 890, 942, 1808, 1832, 1919, 1961, 2169, 3031, 3505, 3950, 3986, 5021, 7391, 8786 and 9492. Further locos. ex Plant include Nos. 29 (4/6) and 1949, 8784, 9464 (5/6). | SLS/194708 |
31/07/1948 | Darlington Works | 'L.1's' are completed up to No. 67727 and the last three are almost finished. The paint dates of Nos. 67719-21 are May, Nos. 67722-26 June and No. 67727 July. The Works' Nos. are 2037-2045, in order. Frames are laid down for the first two 'Pacifics' and it is understood that at least twelve are expected to be completed by the end of the year. No. 7306 the first 'G.5' to be withdrawn is in the scrap yard, together with No. 5115. A start was made on cutting-up 'C.7's' Nos. 2973 an 2982 during W/E 3/7/48 and these will be followed by No. 2954. Further engines of this class have arrived in the Works' road at the shed, and it is expected they will all be scrapped, they are as follows:-Nos. 2975, 2981, 2983, 2988 an 2995. 'J.93' No. 8488 arrived on a truck and was cut-up W/E 29/5/48. Easingwold Rly. No. 2 is still in the Works' yard in a very forlorn condition. The North Sunderland Rly. diesel Lady Armstrong has also been there for a considerable time; No. 8089 is at present working on the N.S. Rly. The frames of two ex G.N.R. 'Atlantic's' (still complete with cylinders) have been shortened and are being used back to back as a boiler wagon. 'B.1' No. 61014 is ex works painted black and fully lined, but minus name plates-the name being chalked on one side of the smokebox. Other locomotives noted painted black and fully lined include Nos. 60834, 60942, 61019 an 62751. Locomotives ex works to July 3rd, include:-Nos. 60919, 61410, 62724, 63282/90, 63345, 65024/64, 65575, 65673, 65708/54/62/75, 65816/41, 67613/29, 68245, 68307/58/91, 68706/61, 69771/98, 69833/37, 69854/66 an 69917. Locomotives for works during the same period include:-Nos. 509, 824/98, 920, 1012/19, 2375/79, 2706/61/68, 3250/64, 5099, 5670/92, 5774, 7246/95, 7305/06, 7603/05/10/16/30/35/61/78/90, 8262/91, 8358/60/93, 8434, 9781/82, 9832/52/57/82/85/93 an 61420. |
SLS/194808 |
02/12/1948 | Darlington Works | Further new Class 'A.1' locomotives, Nos. 60134-37, ex North Road bear Works, Nos. 2053-56, in order. Locomotives awaiting Works: Nos. 970, 1642/44/72, 2344/65/90, 2715, E2718, 3292, E3311, E3314, 3399, 3420, 5100, 5856, 7283, 7636/69, 8015, 8275, 8313, 8698, 8745, 9792, 9842/89, 60942, 62737/64, 63290, 67672, 67719/23 (both light repairs), 69784. The following were sent to the scrap yard:-Nos. 3253/92/95, 3323/27, 8090 an 9103. Locomotives ex Works: Nos. 60507 (unlined black, new chimney), 61019, 61627/38, 62371/91, 62708/47, 63140, 63344/58, 65706/17, 65803/14/32/52/83/89, 67300, 67311 (auto fitted), 67312, 67688, 68014 (altered bunker), 68245/95, 68426, 68678 (vacuum ejector), 68699, 69776, 69841/81/91, 69862 (first 'A.8' to be lined out), 69881/91, 'Austerity' 77050, 77195/99, 77329. |
SLS/194901 |
31/12/1948 | Darlington Works | Locomotives awaiting Works during December included:-Nos. 952, 1437, 1625/41, 2378, 2970 (the last 'C.7'), 3368, 5639, 5650 (badly damaged at Jervaulx), 5693, 5759/97, 5807, 7278, 7651, 8010/37, 8155, 8292, 9792, 9892, 60510, 62732/33, 65056, 67704/05/10/19/23, 69910/33, 'Austerity' 70877, 77414/69. Locomotives ex Works during December included:-Nos. 60918/42/70, 61432, 61601/29/30/51, 62344/65, 62728/31/54, 63352, 63423, 65033, 65856, 67283, 67342, 67636/39/87, 67701, 68016 (altered bunker), 68264/75, 68436, 68696, 68745, 69102, 69794, 69842/79/89, 'Austerity' 77329. Locomotives broken up: Nos. 2390 an 3327. The two Class 'V.2's' which have hitherto been used as main line pilots, have now been replaced by Class 'A.3' Nos. 70 an 76. | SLS/194902 |
09/07/1961 | Darlington MPD (Ex-Works) | Waiting Works: D237, 60814, 61020, 63448, 67731/69, 78015, 90415. Ex-Works: 60872, 60928/42, 61273, 61303, 61448/64, 65801/93, 67636/90, 80099, 80100, 90465, 90710, 92147/92. | SLS/196108 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
13/03/1942 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3644 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1881 Allocated to Gateshead (GHD) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
07/01/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/01/1943. Dep: 08/02/1943. | ||
15/07/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/07/1943. Dep: 30/08/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29356 (Diagram 109) |
||
25/08/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/08/1945. Dep: 29/09/1945. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 842 but not taken up | ||
17/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 942 | ||
12/04/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1947. Dep: 10/05/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2928 (Diagram 109) |
||
08/09/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 60942 | ||
11/11/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1948. Dep: 31/12/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2954 (Diagram 109) |
||
06/01/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/01/1949. Dep: 13/01/1949. | ||
18/01/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/01/1949. Dep: 28/01/1949. | ||
09/03/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/03/1950. Dep: 27/03/1950. | ||
10/08/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1950. Dep: 08/09/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29441 (Diagram 109) |
||
19/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
30/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
04/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
10/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
09/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
15/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
03/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/11/1951. Dep: 14/11/1951. Work undertaken: Modified pony truck |
||
17/06/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 17/06/1952. Dep: 12/07/1952. | ||
14/07/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/07/1952. Dep: 15/07/1952. | ||
02/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/01/1953. Dep: 22/01/1953. | ||
07/10/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/10/1954. Dep: 06/11/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29408 (Diagram 109) |
||
08/11/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/11/1954. Dep: 09/11/1954. | ||
25/10/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 25/10/1955. Dep: 19/11/1955. | ||
05/11/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 05/11/1956. Dep: 14/12/1956. Work undertaken: Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
||
17/12/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/12/1956. Dep: 19/12/1956. | ||
24/12/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/12/1956. Dep: 29/12/1956. | ||
16/06/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
25/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/08/1958. Dep: 26/09/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29491 (Diagram 109) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
26/02/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/02/1959. Dep: 02/03/1959. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
16/11/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 16/11/1959. Dep: 30/12/1959. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
06/06/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1961. Dep: 08/07/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29541 (Diagram 109) Smith speedometer fitted |
||
28/07/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/07/1961. Dep: 18/08/1961. | ||
02/12/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
25/05/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60942 from York (North) (50A) | ||
24/08/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |