|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 14/07/1942 | 15/07/1942 | 2 days | Special | Tender change |
||
Doncaster Works | 27/11/1943 | 25/12/1943 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/12/1945 | 12/01/1946 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/07/1946 | 07/09/1946 | 43 days | Light Repair | Hatfield derailment |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/08/1947 | 05/09/1947 | 34 days | General | Modified pony truck |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/01/1950 | 03/03/1950 | 61 days | General | Boiler number 3129 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60943 |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/03/1951 | 06/04/1951 | 10 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/05/1952 | 01/07/1952 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 29342 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 30/10/1953 | 23/11/1953 | 25 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/08/1954 | 06/10/1954 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 29357 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/06/1956 | 24/07/1956 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 29414 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 12/03/1958 | 16/04/1958 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 28061 (Diagram 109) Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 07/06/1960 | 24/09/1960 | 110 days | General | Boiler number 28081 (Diagram 109) Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/03/1962 | 09/03/1962 | 5 days | Unclassified |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
26/03/1942 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3645 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1882 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
14/07/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Special) - Arr: 14/07/1942. Dep: 15/07/1942. Work undertaken: Tender change |
||
27/11/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/11/1943. Dep: 25/12/1943. | ||
08/12/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/12/1945. Dep: 12/01/1946. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 843 but not taken up | ||
27/07/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/07/1946. Dep: 07/09/1946. Work undertaken: Hatfield derailment |
||
24/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
04/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 943 | ||
02/02/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
03/08/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/08/1947. Dep: 05/09/1947. Work undertaken: Modified pony truck |
||
02/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/01/1950. Dep: 03/03/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3129 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60943 |
||
28/03/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/03/1951. Dep: 06/04/1951. | ||
27/05/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/05/1952. Dep: 01/07/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29342 (Diagram 109) |
||
30/10/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/10/1953. Dep: 23/11/1953. | ||
30/08/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/08/1954. Dep: 06/10/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29357 (Diagram 109) |
||
26/06/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
13/06/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1956. Dep: 24/07/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29414 (Diagram 109) |
||
20/10/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (35A) | ||
10/11/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
12/03/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1958. Dep: 16/04/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28061 (Diagram 109) Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
07/06/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/06/1960. Dep: 24/09/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28081 (Diagram 109) Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
||
05/03/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/03/1962. Dep: 09/03/1962. | ||
23/09/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60943 from Doncaster (36A) | ||
15/10/1962 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |