|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 26/02/1944 | 08/04/1944 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/10/1945 | 01/12/1945 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/10/1947 | 19/11/1947 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 3220 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/01/1950 | 03/02/1950 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 2978 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60945 |
||
Darlington Works | 29/08/1951 | 02/10/1951 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 29514 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 30/11/1951 | 13/12/1951 | 14 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 10/07/1953 | 21/08/1953 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 29460 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/03/1955 | 09/04/1955 | 34 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 08/02/1957 | 15/03/1957 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 29342 (Diagram 109) Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
||
Darlington Works | 28/07/1958 | 29/08/1958 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 29538 (Diagram 109) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 12/02/1959 | 16/02/1959 | 5 days | Unclassified | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 09/03/1961 | 29/04/1961 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 29397 (Diagram 109) Smith speedometer fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 09/05/1961 | 19/05/1961 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 25/05/1961 | 03/06/1961 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 27/02/1963 | 11/03/1963 | 13 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
20/09/1964 | Swindon Works (Outside in works yard) | On the occasion of the Society farewell to the last G.W.R. County class tour, the following were on works:- Erecting Shop: D602, D806/19/37/43/9, D1001/6/9/14/15/28/32/43/58, D6335/57, D7009/73, 2210, 6862, 6951, 7803, 7924, 43001/137, 73034 an 92223. New Construction: D9512 complete and painted, D9513-6 almost complete, D9517-24 under construction. Top end of shop, PWM653, D3026/32/190/807/14/24. Weighing shed: D850, D1049, Outside in works yard: 4659, 8405/9, 8732, 9425/27, 42954/78, 43115/20, 60941/45, D1016/24, D6352, D7048, N.C.B. 0-6-2T (ex T.V.R.) and King 6000 (for movement to Stratford). Scrap yard: 2818, 5698, 6010, 6824/7/73, 7929, 8418, 9484, 60809/12/33/6/87, 60916/22/5/32/64/75, 43012/112. Stock shed: D3352, D6826, D9510/11. | SLS/196410 |
11/10/1964 | Swindon Works (C shop area) | Erecting shop: D602, D806/15/7/32/7/43/9, D1006/16/24/32/58/60/72, D3025/32/190/807/20/966, D6335/52/6, D7017/46/63, 2210, 6823/7, 6951, 7924/9, 42945/75, 43001/112/20/37, 73034, 92223, D9515/6 Painted, D9517-20 Cabs, D9521-7 Motors, D9528/9 Frames; PWM653; C shop area: NCB 67 (ex-TVR) and 6000 still awaiting movement to Stratford; 2818, 3748, 4626, 5264, 5602, 6010, 6824/73, 8401/18, 9484, 9752, 43003, 60809/12/56/87/916/22/32/41/5, 78009; Outside Erecting shop: 7803, 43012; Turntable area: D830/60, D1010/20, D3437, D7022/7/64, 4659, 8405/9, 9425, 9454, 42954; Stored Stock shed: 1010/2/4, 3702, 4569, 4916, 5963/75, 6804, 73012 | SLS/196411 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
15/05/1942 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3647 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1884 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
15/02/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
26/02/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/02/1944. Dep: 08/04/1944. | ||
20/10/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/10/1945. Dep: 01/12/1945. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 845 but not taken up | ||
27/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
01/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 945 | ||
15/10/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/10/1947. Dep: 19/11/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3220 (Diagram 109) |
||
03/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/01/1950. Dep: 03/02/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2978 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60945 |
||
04/02/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
29/08/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/08/1951. Dep: 02/10/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29514 (Diagram 109) |
||
30/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/11/1951. Dep: 13/12/1951. | ||
06/07/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
12/07/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
10/07/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/07/1953. Dep: 21/08/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29460 (Diagram 109) |
||
15/11/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
07/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 07/03/1955. Dep: 09/04/1955. | ||
08/02/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/02/1957. Dep: 15/03/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29342 (Diagram 109) Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
||
28/07/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/07/1958. Dep: 29/08/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29538 (Diagram 109) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
12/02/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/02/1959. Dep: 16/02/1959. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
09/03/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/03/1961. Dep: 29/04/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29397 (Diagram 109) Smith speedometer fitted |
||
09/05/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/05/1961. Dep: 19/05/1961. | ||
25/05/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/05/1961. Dep: 03/06/1961. | ||
02/12/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
27/02/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/02/1963. Dep: 11/03/1963. | ||
06/07/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60945 from York (North) (50A) | ||
08/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |