|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 19/06/1942 | 05/08/1942 | 48 days | Heavy | Big end and middle cylinder failure |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/08/1944 | 07/10/1944 | 45 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/08/1946 | 21/09/1946 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/10/1948 | 04/12/1948 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 3244 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60946 |
||
Darlington Works | 27/02/1951 | 31/03/1951 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 29458 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/12/1951 | 08/01/1952 | 20 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 24/02/1953 | 28/03/1953 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 29353 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 30/03/1953 | 31/03/1953 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 22/06/1954 | 22/06/1954 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 05/02/1955 | 05/03/1955 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 29366 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/03/1955 | 17/03/1955 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 06/06/1955 | 27/06/1955 | 22 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 04/12/1956 | 08/01/1957 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 29498 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/12/1958 | 15/01/1959 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 29452 (Diagram 109) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 02/04/1959 | 03/04/1959 | 2 days | Unclassified | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 04/08/1961 | 02/09/1961 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 29491 (Diagram 109) Smith speedometer fitted |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/09/1945 | Leeds Area | Latest B.16/3 843 appeared on 2.5.p.m. Darlington-Leeds turn on 20/9. B.17 2826 was noted on 3/10 working north on a Class A Goods on the main line near Thirsk. N.13 2405 and J.21 1593 proceeded north through Ripon on 5/10 coupled together (1593 'dead') apparently going to works. The chief effect of the new timetables seems to have been a reduction in the loading of long distance passenger trains. The 9.20 a.m. Newcastle-Liverpool E.P. during the first eleven days of the new timetable consisted of 14-16 bogies, compared with 15-18 previously. It has now been cut to 12 daily and the train is still double-headed from Ripon to Leeds. During the summer the relief to this train usually was made up of 12-14 bogies, and was always worked by one engine! Ex-N.E. Z have been much in evidence on Neville Hill turns lately. Since 4/10 the following combinations have been noted on the 9.20 Newcastle-Liverpool: 2204 & 4866; 2193, 2206 an 722 all piloting 2568 on different days; 2208 & 3648; and 729 & 211 on the 9.0 Liverpool-Newcastle: On 12/10 the relief 9.20 Newcastle-Liverpool was worked by K.2 4651 with 10 bogies, and piloted from Ripon by A.6 688 bunker first. D.21 1245 which was awaiting works at the Darlington shed visit in July, has reappeared, and was first noted on 8/10, piloting D.20 1210 on the 9.40 a.m. Leeds to Middlesbrough (a regular double-headed working). | SLS/194601 |
09/09/1963 | Thornaby MPD (in store) | The steam allocation here is now in store viz. 60859/946, 65859/84, 67635/40, 68023/39, 76024, 77001/11/4, 90072/81/406/46/51/593. From 9th September (when West Aukland closed) seven type 3 d/es now work all former West Aukland duties. | SLS/196310 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
21/05/1942 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3648 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1885 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
19/06/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 19/06/1942. Dep: 05/08/1942. Work undertaken: Big end and middle cylinder failure |
||
24/08/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1944. Dep: 07/10/1944. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 846 but not taken up | ||
07/07/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 946 | ||
24/08/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1946. Dep: 21/09/1946. | ||
28/10/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1948. Dep: 04/12/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3244 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60946 |
||
27/02/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/02/1951. Dep: 31/03/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29458 (Diagram 109) |
||
20/12/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/12/1951. Dep: 08/01/1952. | ||
24/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1953. Dep: 28/03/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29353 (Diagram 109) |
||
30/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/03/1953. Dep: 31/03/1953. | ||
22/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 22/06/1954. Dep: 22/06/1954. | ||
05/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1955. Dep: 05/03/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29366 (Diagram 109) |
||
07/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/03/1955. Dep: 17/03/1955. | ||
06/06/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/06/1955. Dep: 27/06/1955. | ||
26/06/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
25/09/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
04/12/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/12/1956. Dep: 08/01/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29498 (Diagram 109) |
||
08/12/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/12/1958. Dep: 15/01/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29452 (Diagram 109) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
02/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/04/1959. Dep: 03/04/1959. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
14/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
13/09/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) | ||
04/08/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/08/1961. Dep: 02/09/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29491 (Diagram 109) Smith speedometer fitted |
||
05/07/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
11/10/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60946 from Gateshead (52A) | ||
11/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Ellis Metals: Derwenthaugh Road, Swalwell |