|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 03/11/1944 | 09/12/1944 | 37 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/06/1946 | 13/07/1946 | 36 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 959 |
||
Darlington Works | 23/10/1946 | 09/11/1946 | 18 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/03/1948 | 15/05/1948 | 53 days | General | Boiler number 3230 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60959 |
||
Darlington Works | 10/07/1950 | 22/08/1950 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 3356 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 28/08/1950 | 06/09/1950 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 05/12/1951 | 17/12/1951 | 13 days | Light Casual | Modified pony truck |
||
Darlington Works | 26/09/1952 | 25/10/1952 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 29481 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 31/10/1952 | 05/11/1952 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 21/05/1954 | 19/06/1954 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 29524 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 31/01/1956 | 13/03/1956 | 43 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 20/03/1956 | 23/03/1956 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 28/08/1957 | 28/09/1957 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 29459 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/10/1958 | 13/11/1958 | 32 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 03/06/1959 | 09/07/1959 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 28072 (Diagram 109) Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 29/07/1959 | 07/08/1959 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 30/01/1962 | 16/03/1962 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 29368 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/12/1962 | 21/01/1963 | 26 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/12/1946 | General | N.E. Area: During the five weeks from 29th October, Dynamometer Car tests were carried out on the 9.45 a.m. Newcastle-Liverpool (Lime St.) E.P. between Newcastle and Leeds, the return to Newcastle being on the 1.50 p.m. ex. Leeds (the normal working). The locos. concerned were 'A.2' 500 Edward Thompson and 'V.2' 959. The latter loco. had presumably recently been through Darlington Works, as she worked the 1.57 p.m. Darlington-Leeds (running-in) turn on 4/10. The exact sequence as far as the 9.45 'Liverpool' was concerned was as follows:-No. 500, with 9 bogies, including the Dynamometer Car and Buffet Car and repainted Pullman Coach 477, worked the trip on 29/10, 30/10, 5/11, 6/11, and 7/11; the same engine hauled the train on the four days 12-15/11, when the load was augmented to 14 bogie coaches. No. 959 commenced running on 19/11 with the 14-coach train, and ran the four days to 22/11; on 26/11 and 27/11 959's load was reduced to the 9-coach level; and on 28/11 and 29/11 this was increased to ten coaches. This train has been worked frequently by new 'A.2' Nos. 511/2/5. The normal load is now 9 bogies, with increases up to 13 coaches at week-ends and holiday times. Before the introduction of the new time-tables on 7/10 the normal load was 12 coaches, with regular pilot assistance from Ripon to Leeds. Now any load is taken without assistance! | SLS/194702 |
11/02/1962 | Darlington Works (Works Yard) | Erecting Shop: D14/7/8/24/6, D3071/4, D4087-92, D5108/48/73-5, 12120, 60807/35/7, 60931, 61035, 61274, 63438/64/70/2, 65892, 67742, 80117, 90310, 90677/95, 92202, Weigh House: Nil. Outside Weigh House: 82027, Stripping Shop: 46407, 65751, 80116. Outside Stripping Shop: 46460, 61039, 61383, 67753, 68064, 68672. Works Yard: D281, D2173, D2589, 43016/53/5/71, 60954/9/77/81, 63412, 65099, 65794, 65889, 67609, 68010/43, 80119. 90603. Crossing: D257/78/80, D2247, D4086, D5107/49. Scrap Road: 61201, 61368, 61411-3/5/9/36/43/50/1/60, 64979, 65741/69, 65839, 67707/22/7/39/50/75, 68063, 68674/80/88/9/98, 68703/29/34. | SLS/196204 |
11/09/1963 | Inverurie Works (Awaiting cut up) | In Shops: 44724, 45066, 80126; awaiting shops-42737, 45475. Shopped during period 5/8-6/9: 42129, 65234, 65908/22, D6140/3/4. Scrapped during same period: 57565, 61260, 65210/41/60, 67606/15/49/74. Being cup up: 60851, 65316. Awaiting cut up: 60959, 64568, 90536/42. | SLS/196310 |
10/10/1963 | Inverurie Works (Scrapped) | 42737, 42909, 45475, 65918. In Scrap Yard: 60819/27, 64627, 65253/341. Shopped four weeks ended 4/10-44724, 45066, 80126, D6148/50, D8031; Scrapped same period-45049, 60851/959, 64568, 65316, 90193, 90536/42. | SLS/196311 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/11/1942 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3671 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1898 Allocated to Gateshead (GHD) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
03/11/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/11/1944. Dep: 09/12/1944. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 859 but not taken up | ||
08/06/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/06/1946. Dep: 13/07/1946. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 959 |
||
23/10/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/10/1946. Dep: 09/11/1946. | ||
24/03/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1948. Dep: 15/05/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3230 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60959 |
||
06/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
12/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
13/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
19/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (STM) | ||
06/03/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) | ||
12/03/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY) | ||
10/07/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/07/1950. Dep: 22/08/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3356 (Diagram 109) |
||
28/08/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/08/1950. Dep: 06/09/1950. | ||
05/12/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/12/1951. Dep: 17/12/1951. Work undertaken: Modified pony truck |
||
26/09/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/09/1952. Dep: 25/10/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29481 (Diagram 109) |
||
31/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/10/1952. Dep: 05/11/1952. | ||
21/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/05/1954. Dep: 19/06/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29524 (Diagram 109) |
||
31/01/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 31/01/1956. Dep: 13/03/1956. | ||
20/03/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/03/1956. Dep: 23/03/1956. | ||
28/08/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/08/1957. Dep: 28/09/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29459 (Diagram 109) |
||
28/10/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
21/04/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) | ||
13/10/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 13/10/1958. Dep: 13/11/1958. | ||
03/06/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/06/1959. Dep: 09/07/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28072 (Diagram 109) Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
||
29/07/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/07/1959. Dep: 07/08/1959. | ||
11/04/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
30/01/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/01/1962. Dep: 16/03/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29368 (Diagram 109) |
||
27/12/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/12/1962. Dep: 21/01/1963. | ||
31/12/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) | ||
01/07/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60959 from Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) | ||
04/10/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Inverurie |