|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 11/10/1944 | 11/11/1944 | 32 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/07/1946 | 10/08/1946 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/05/1948 | 05/06/1948 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 29539 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60965 |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/08/1948 | 28/08/1948 | 20 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/12/1948 | 15/01/1949 | 24 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 26/04/1950 | 25/05/1950 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 2998 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/06/1950 | 12/06/1950 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/06/1950 | 15/07/1950 | 18 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 28/01/1952 | 28/02/1952 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 29528 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/03/1952 | 08/03/1952 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 22/01/1954 | 20/02/1954 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 28062 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 31/05/1954 | 07/07/1954 | 38 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 08/07/1954 | 09/08/1954 | 33 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 02/07/1955 | 01/09/1955 | 62 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 02/02/1956 | 20/02/1956 | 19 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 02/11/1956 | 05/12/1956 | 34 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 16/04/1958 | 24/04/1958 | 9 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 02/02/1959 | 02/03/1959 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 29464 (Diagram 109) Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
||
Cowlairs Works | 10/12/1959 | 24/12/1959 | 15 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 31/05/1960 | 10/06/1960 | 11 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 11/03/1961 | 25/03/1961 | 15 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 08/08/1961 | 16/09/1961 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 29451 (Diagram 109) Smith speedometer fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 27/09/1961 | 13/10/1961 | 17 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
18/04/1953 | Scottish Miscellany | The 7.0 p.m. Edinburgh (Waverley) to Glasgow (Queen Street) Sundays only train has this year produced a number of York 50A locos. These include 60140 (three times), 60501 an 60515 (twice), 60502 an 60512. Also seen on this train 60095 (68E), 60965 (64A), 60823 (64A). This train is worked off St. Margarets depot, the engine returning on the Monday morning. No. 67500 a 4-4-2T has occasionally appeared on the Hyndland and Milngavie trains during recent weeks. New loco. No. 76000 was noted on (23/4) on local goods to Buchanan Street. B.R. 2-6-4T are now fairly regularly used on 5.51 p.m. Carlisle to Glasgow (St. Enoch). Water is taken at Dumfries and often at Kilmarnock. With 80008 some excellent work was experienced. A late start of 11 mins. at Carlisle was reduced to a late arrival at Dumfries of 5 mins. A late start from Dumfries of 8 minutes was converted to a 2 min. early arrival at Kilmarnock. Up the Nith Valley 50 m.p.h. was regularly got with eight coaches. From Kilmarnock to a stop at Gorbals Jct. the time was 30 mins. 46 secs. including a 15 m.p.h. crawl from Strathbungo. Between Shilford and Neilson 77 m.p.h. was reached. The crew appeared to have no trouble with the train at any time, in fact one would suggest their only trouble was to hold the engine in check, so freely did it run. 40185 (2-6-2T) has been working the Kirkcudbright branch recently. On occasion of Cup Final in Glasgow on (23/4) the bulk of the trains from Aberdeen were worked by L.M. Class 5, 4-6-0, assisted by 61400 of Kittybrewster depot and 60531 Bahram. |
SLS/195306 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
25/02/1943 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3677 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1905 Allocated to Gateshead (GHD) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
11/10/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/10/1944. Dep: 11/11/1944. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 865 but not taken up | ||
06/07/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/07/1946. Dep: 10/08/1946. | ||
17/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 965 | ||
03/05/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1948. Dep: 05/06/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29539 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60965 |
||
09/08/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/08/1948. Dep: 28/08/1948. | ||
23/12/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/12/1948. Dep: 15/01/1949. | ||
26/04/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/04/1950. Dep: 25/05/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2998 (Diagram 109) |
||
03/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/06/1950. Dep: 12/06/1950. | ||
28/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/06/1950. Dep: 15/07/1950. | ||
28/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/01/1952. Dep: 28/02/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29528 (Diagram 109) |
||
06/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/03/1952. Dep: 08/03/1952. | ||
30/11/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
22/01/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/01/1954. Dep: 20/02/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28062 (Diagram 109) |
||
31/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 31/05/1954. Dep: 07/07/1954. | ||
08/07/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/07/1954. Dep: 09/08/1954. | ||
02/07/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/07/1955. Dep: 01/09/1955. | ||
02/02/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/02/1956. Dep: 20/02/1956. | ||
02/11/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 02/11/1956. Dep: 05/12/1956. | ||
16/04/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/04/1958. Dep: 24/04/1958. | ||
02/02/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/02/1959. Dep: 02/03/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29464 (Diagram 109) Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
||
10/12/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/12/1959. Dep: 24/12/1959. | ||
31/05/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 31/05/1960. Dep: 10/06/1960. | ||
11/03/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/03/1961. Dep: 25/03/1961. | ||
08/08/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/08/1961. Dep: 16/09/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29451 (Diagram 109) Smith speedometer fitted |
||
27/09/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/09/1961. Dep: 13/10/1961. | ||
29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60965 from St Margarets (64A) | ||
11/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Campbells: Shieldhall |