Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1378 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14784 Week
» 67800 Month
» 187327 Year
» 3214180 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
209 |
m/e |
05/1874 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7209 |
|
25/02/1925 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
Y5 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-4-0ST |
Builder |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
Works Number |
1940 |
To Service |
During 05/1874 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 12/11/1926 off Lowestoft (LOW) |
Service Life |
52 yrs, 6 mths , 13 dys |
Notes
Notes |
Cut up at Stratford |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
05/1874 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
12/11/1926 |
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
21/08/1908 |
Diagram 43 boiler fitted (number 209) |
|
Works Visits
Works |
Stopped |
Entry |
Departure |
Duration |
Level of Work |
Actual |
Mileage |
Stratford Works |
|
06/02/1908 |
21/08/1908 |
198 days |
General |
Boiler number 209 (Diagram 43)
|
|
Stratford Works |
|
11/05/1923 |
30/08/1923 |
112 days |
General |
|
|
Stratford Works |
|
08/12/1924 |
25/02/1925 |
80 days |
General |
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 7209
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1874 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 209 Built at Neilson, Reid & Co., Works Number 1940 |
|
|
06/02/1908 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1908. Dep: 21/08/1908. Work undertaken: Boiler number 209 (Diagram 43)
|
|
|
11/05/1923 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1923. Dep: 30/08/1923. |
|
|
08/12/1924 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 08/12/1924. Dep: 25/02/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 7209
|
|
|
12/11/1926 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 7209 from Lowestoft (LOW) |
|
|