Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 784 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18587 Week
» 71603 Month
» 191130 Year
» 3217983 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7231 |
m/e |
04/1903 |
Notes
Notes |
Cut up at Stratford |
|
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
04/1903 |
Diagram 43 boiler fitted (number ?) |
04/1913 |
Diagram 43 boiler fitted (number 231) |
|
Works Visits
Works |
Stopped |
Entry |
Departure |
Duration |
Level of Work |
Actual |
Mileage |
Stratford Works |
|
1913 |
04/1913 |
|
General |
Boiler number 231 (Diagram 43)
|
|
Stratford Works |
|
14/11/1921 |
20/05/1922 |
188 days |
General |
|
|
Stratford Works |
|
14/12/1925 |
26/03/1926 |
103 days |
General |
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 7231
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1903 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 7231 Built at Stratford Works, Works Number 1222 Allocated to Colchester (COL) Diagram 43 boiler fitted |
|
|
1913 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: ?/1913. Dep: ?/04/1913. Work undertaken: Boiler number 231 (Diagram 43)
|
|
|
14/11/1921 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 14/11/1921. Dep: 20/05/1922. |
|
|
14/12/1925 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 14/12/1925. Dep: 26/03/1926. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 7231
|
|
|
16/07/1931 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 7231 from Colchester (COL) |
|
|