Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 4188 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17594 Week
» 70610 Month
» 190137 Year
» 3216990 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
73009 |
on |
19/07/1951 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
63A |
Perth South |
on |
19/07/1951 |
ALLOC |
67A |
Corkerhill |
7w/e |
29/12/1962 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
14/07/1966 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
03/08/1951 |
Standard Class 5MT |
The Royal Train was hauled through Forfar on 3rd August by two standard class 5MT locomotives, 73005 an 73006. Both are shedded at Perth and have been working between that city and Aberdeen. Just over a week later, 73009 worked the test train, the 17.30 from Aberdeen to Glasgow, made up to 407 tons. She was 4 minutes down at Stonehaven (p.w.s. and signals), but regained 3 minutes to Forfar. The Shed Master at Forfar is Bill Sharp, an old Caley man, and all locomotives allocated there are spotless, inside and out. |
SLS/195111 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
19/07/1951 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 73009 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Perth South (63A) |
|
|
19/01/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Corkerhill (67A) |
|
|
14/07/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 73009 |
|
|
09/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw |
|
|