|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
05/03/1961 | Eastleigh Works (Erecting Shop) | Works Yard: 32107, 34078, 35007/26, 76059/62. Erecting Shop: D2274, D3465, E5004/6/17, 15233, 30106, 30254, 30501/6/13/20, 30667, 30863, 32300, 32662, 34062/96/7, 34108, 35016/7/20, 41318, 73019, 73117, 75066/71, 76007/65, 80018/43/81, 82015, Longmoor Military Rly. 600. Behind Boiler Shop: 15202/28, 30826. Scrap Road: 30031, 30128. | SLS/196104 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/10/1951 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 73019 Built at Derby Works |
||
03/10/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B) | ||
14/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bath Green Park (S&D) (82F) | ||
16/07/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (82E) | ||
08/10/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bath Green Park (S&D) (82F) | ||
21/04/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gloucester Barnwood (85C) | ||
04/05/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B) | ||
01/11/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Oxley (2B) | ||
30/04/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bolton (9K) | ||
14/01/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 73019 | ||
05/1967 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |