|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
17/10/1958 | Derby Works (Erecting Shop, No. 1 bay) | 17th October, 1958. Paint shop-42392 G, 42525 G, 48008 G, 75043 G, 80043 G, D3553/4 (new-Order D658), D5002 (new-order B251). Diesel Erecting Shop- 10202/3, 12090, 15004, D3555-3564 (new-order D658), outside- 10201. Test House- D5001, D5700. Erecting Shop, No. 1 bay- 41157 I, 42324 G, 42328 G, 42502 G, 42508 G, 42524 G, 44082 G, 44304 G, 44516 G, 47674 G, 48305 G, 48324 G, 48332 G, 73023 I, 75040 G. Stripping- 44466, 48363, 80060 an 80144. Erecting Shop, No. 2 Bay- 42367 I, 47589 G, 48530 G, 48617 I, 80143 I; Stripping- 40694, 42513 an 44137. Yard- 40047, 40680/931, 41167, 42370/513, 43231/301/522/815, 47309, 12096 an 15000. | SLS/195811 |
30/05/1959 | Chester MPD (6E) | The W.R. has taken over all freight workings of this shed (now under LMR control) and as a result have gained back from the LMR all the locomotives transferred in exchange for W.R. types. Engines transferred LMR to WR to cover these freight workings are-48402/12/5/7/8/24/30/44/71, 73021/3/4/5/6, 75005/6/26. The only engines left at 6E now are several 82XXX tanks and a few standards. | SLS/195907 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/11/1951 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 73023 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Patricroft (10C) |
||
03/10/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Chester West (84K) | ||
11/04/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C) | ||
21/05/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) | ||
22/06/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bath Green Park (S&D) (82F) | ||
12/10/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Oxford (81F) | ||
25/08/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 73023 | ||
11/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |