|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
23/04/1961 | Wolverhampton Works (Works Yard) | Erecting Shop: 1442/72, 1503, 2204, 3788, 3816, 4101/14, 4635, 4938, 5322, 5920, 6130, 6608/15, 7244/53, 7413/24/37, 7828, 9412/84/98, 9657, 9746, 82033. Works Yard: 3711/49, 4168/687, 6126, 6839, 8437, 9792, 73037, 75021, 92004. | SLS/196106 |
02/07/1961 | Stafford Road Works (Works Yard) | Erecting Shop: 1455, 2217, 3210, 3610, 3792, 4110/20, 4290, 4703, 4910/96, 5416, 5563/8/70, 5679, 5957, 6611/68, 7308/39, 7403, 8403, 9464, 9674, 9778. Weigh House : D3034, 1011. Works Yard: 1003/7, 2249, 3201, 3618, 4591, 5548, 5694, 5933, 6314, 6424, 6688, 7244, 73037. | SLS/196108 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/09/1953 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 73037 Built at Derby Works |
||
03/10/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G) | ||
03/11/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyseley (84E) | ||
25/01/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G) | ||
21/04/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) | ||
22/06/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (82E) | ||
12/10/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Oxford (81F) | ||
28/03/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D) | ||
08/06/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Guildford (70C) | ||
27/06/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) | ||
09/07/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 73037 | ||
03/1968 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |