23/01/1954 |
Holbeck MPD |
Holbeck shed now provides the motive power for the 9.22 a.m. Leeds City (8.46 a.m. from Bradford) to Scarborough instead of Neville Hill (50B). The engine returns on the 12.38 p.m. Scarborough to York, 3.10 p.m. York to Leeds, empties to Neville Hill, and light engine to Holbeck. Amongst 20A engines noted on this turn have been Stanier Class 5 4-6-0's 44852, 44854, 44943, 44944, an 45238, together with 44755 (Caprotti) and 73045 (standard B.R.), and 44901 of 68A complete with snowplough. |
SLS/195403 |
31/03/1954 |
York Area |
The Holbeck (20A) turn to Scarborough mentioned in last month's notes has brought most of the Stanier Class 5 4-6-0's from Holbeck into York on various occasions; 73045 also appears frequently. 44810 (21A) appeared on it on 6/3/54. 44780 (25B) was under repair in York shed on 12/2/54. 61131 (37A) worked the 9.22 a.m. York to King's Cross as far as Doncaster on 12/2/54 instead of the customary Doncaster A3 or V2. 61131 returned to York at 1.26 p.m. on the 7.20 a.m. from Colchester. This latter train is normally hauled by a Doncaster B1, although V2's from New England are occasionally used instead. Two Scottish Region A3's called at York shed recently, returning north after overhaul at Doncaster Works, namely 60100 (64B) on 19/2/54 and 60095 (68E) on 3/3/54. 46465 (31A) was at York shed on 12/3/54, returning, to Cambridge after overhaul at Darlington Works. On 24/2/54 90145 (40B) arrived at York from the Hull via Market Weighton line hauling 69094 (53A) for Darlington Works. 67739 (32B) was also at York shed on the same date en route for Darlington Works in a very dilapidated condition. Pantomime excursions to Leeds were run on 2/3/54 from both Scarborough and Kirbymoorside. One of the two Scarborough trains called at Weaverthorpe, Rillington, Strensall and Haxby stations, which have been closed to regular passenger traffic for many years. The excursion from Kirbymoorside called at Nawton, Helmsley, Gilling and Coxwold (closed early in 1953). |
SLS/195404 |
17/12/1959 |
Derby Works (Erecting Shop, No. 1 Bay) |
Paint Shop: M.R. 1000, 42527 I, 47616 G, 48326 G, 80082 G, D3801, D5066 (New). Diesel Erecting Shop: ED4/6, 12093/7, D3053, D5705/16, D8209. New Work: D3802, D3937-41, Diesel Finishing Shop: D5026, D5068-70. Test House: D9, D5067. Erecting Shop, No. 1 Bay: 42315 G, 42413 G, 42629 G, 43903 G, 44248/334/368 I, 44444 G, 44514 G, 44580 I, 44596 G, 47547 I, 48009 G, 48097/146/386/446 G, 48543 I, 48716 G, 73045 I, 75058 I, 80086 G. Stripping: 43809/999. Erecting Shop, No. 2 Bay: 44235/429 I, 73013/127 I, 75052 I, 80141 I. Erecting Shop, No. 3 Bay: 7 Bo-Bo 1160 H.P. D-E (D5071-7) D8, 3 1-Co-Co-1, 2300 H.P. D-E (D10-D12). Yard: 40413/680/925, 41975, 42312/54/61/507, 43370, 43531/665/759/998, 44140/50/274/326/79, 47299/309/482, 48205, 58190, 73129/32, 75054, 10100/800, D2/5, D2910, D5014, D5718, D8002. |
SLS/196001 |
09/01/1961 |
Derby Works (Works Sidings) |
Diesel Erecting Shop, ED2/4/6, D2508, D2902, D5086, D5705/11, D8008, 10800, 11117, 12058/89, 13126/171/5. Test House: D18, D229, D3368/568, D5146/7, D8001. New Building: D21-D28, D5085. Finishing Shop: D17, D20, D3022, D5134/49. Erecting Shop: 41537, 42067/91, 42254/388/511/8, 43969/77, 44182/209/540/51, 44843, 47164/231, 48132/41/223/61/315/83/495/766, 92091. Paint Shop: D19, M1000, 42071, 47359/92, 48007. In Works Sidings: 40028, 42076, 42300/97/439/530/9, 43194, 43572/4/954, 44167/268, 47212/347/401, 48386, 48619/89, 58850, 73045, 92129. |
SLS/196102 |
18/02/1963 |
Derby Works (Erecting Shop-No. 1 bay) |
Diesel Erecting Shop: D70/1, D82, D104, D116/7, D120, D138, D5013/25/7/76/85, D5144/86. Test House: D114/39, D5187. Diesel Finishing Shop: D6, D99, D5189/90/1. Paint Shop: D105 D3085, D5188. Erecting Shop-No. 1 bay: 47447/53, 48370, 73013/45/156, 75049/51, D109, D3056, ED6, ED7; Erecting Shop-No. 2 bay: D108, D2387, D3245/372, D5075/87; Erecting Shop-No. 3 bay: D5192-D5207 new construction. Works Yard: 40031, 42306/14, 42472, 42500, 43958, 44394, 47302/4, D42, D52/8, D64, D68, D80, D96, D107, D118, D3248, D3863, D5018, ED3. Stored outside Works office: 10000, 10201/2/3. |
SLS/196303 |
12/03/1963 |
Derby Works (Erecting Shop-No. 1 bay) |
D42, D78, D82, D99, D107, D117/9, D120/1, D5027/88, D5393. Outside: D5002/18, D5189. Test House: D48, D113/8, D3372, D5136/87/8/91/2/3. Diesel Finishing Shop: D70, D5010, D5194/5/6. Paint Shop: D5190. Erecting Shop-No. 1 bay: 43637, 44393, 48619, 73045, 75061, D8, D2913, D3020, D5012, ED6/7; Erecting Shop-No. 2 bay: D54, D109, D5083/4; Erecting Shop-No. 3 bay: D5197-D5210 new. Works yard: 40026, 42392/422/72/500, 42784, 44004/112, 44228 frames, 44519, 47003, 47276, 58138, 73159, u60093, D64, D94, D111, D130, D5005/31. Stored outside Works offices: 10000/201/2/3. |
SLS/196304 |
30/04/1963 |
Oswestry Works (Erecting Shop-No. 1 bay) |
Oswestry Works in April contained ex GSWR 0-6-0T ex Hafod Colliery (NBL 21621 of 1917). |
SLS/196304 |