|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
07/09/1963 | Eastleigh Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: 30073, 30824, 33037, 34006/15/21/33/41/51, 34043 partially cut up, 35014/7/8/25/7, 41316/24, 73049/51, 75069, 76010/28/68, 80015/31/42/82, D3668, D4100, D6536/45, E5007, E6001. Test House: 31834. Scrap Yard: 30510, 30911. Works Yard: 35010, WD601 ex works, 31400, 31846, 34036 damaged front end, 34055 (with smoke-box door from 34043), 35029, 73110 (all waiting works), 30915, 31818, 32338, 32635/61 waiting scrap. | SLS/196310 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
30/12/1953 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 73049 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Leicester Midland (15C) |
||
12/08/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bath Green Park (S&D) (71G) | ||
23/04/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G) | ||
16/06/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (82E) | ||
14/07/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bath Green Park (S&D) (82F) | ||
12/10/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Oxford (81F) | ||
19/03/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 73049 | ||
06/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Birds: Long Marston |