Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 62 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 2988 Week
» 4726 Month
» 132169 Year
» 1797545 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 75014 on 06/12/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4
Company History BR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 391
To Service Sat 06/12/1951 to Patricroft (10C)
Withdrawal w/e Sat 31/12/1966
Service Life 15 yrs , 25 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
10C   Patricroft (New) on 06/12/1951
6G   Llandudno Junction 4w/e 03/10/1953
6A   Chester (MR) 8w/e 05/10/1957
6G   Llandudno Junction w/e 20/06/1959
6A   Chester (MR) w/e 12/09/1959
6B   Mold Junction w/e 09/04/1960
1E   Bletchley w/e 05/05/1962
5D   Stoke w/e 21/09/1963
2A   Tyseley w/e 20/06/1964
6D   Shrewsbury w/e 19/09/1964
     Withdrawn w/e 31/12/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 10C Patricroft w/e 08/12/1951
NEW 91M To London Midland Region m/e 31/12/1951
ALLOC 6G Llandudno Junction 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 05/10/1957
ALLOC 6G Llandudno Junction 6w/e 11/07/1959
ALLOC 6A Chester (MR) 3w/e 26/09/1959
ALLOC 6B Mold Junction 5w/e 30/04/1960
ALLOC 1E Bletchley 5w/e 05/05/1962
ALLOC 5D Stoke 5w/e 12/10/1963
ALLOC 2A Tyseley 5w/e 11/07/1964
ALLOC 6D Shrewsbury 3w/e 03/10/1964
WDN   w/e 31/12/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
16/11/1962 Derby Works (Erecting Shop) Diesel Erecting Shop: D4, D36, D58, D83, D91, D112, D121, D144, D191, D5010, D5023/87. Outside D.E. Shop : D5, D56, D114, D128, D5027. Test House: D5032, D5127. Outside Test House: D9, D115, D5005, Pullman uM60091. Shunter Test House : D2908. New Building : D165, D189, D192/3, D5186-5195. Finishing Shop: D74, D131, D188, D190, D5001/31. Erecting Shop: D87, D93, D118, D3126, 42087, 47326/38/78, 48395, 73011/6/25/46, 73136/41, 75003/14. Paint Shop: M.R. 1000 (Paintwork being touched up). Stone Pit: 47642, 48494, 75013. Foundry Row : D65, D81, 10000, 10202, 42500, 43496, 75056. Klondyke Sidings : ED6, ED7, D5145, D5400. Bone Yard : 10201/3, 42146. On Shed awaiting cut up : 40088. Ex Works on Shed: ED3, D2236 (5B), D2507 (6C), D5021 (1A), 43994, 47000, 73139. SLS/196212
16/10/1967 Barry Works Dumped locomotives - behind the works: 2807, 2857, 2861, 2874, 2885, 3803, 3822, 4141, 4247, 4248, 4930, 4936, 4942, 4953, 4979, 4983, 5029, 5043, 5051, 5080, 5164, 5199, 5224, 5239, 5322, 5637, 5643, 5668, 5900, 5967, 5972, 6619, 6634, 6686, 6960, 6989, 7027, 7200, 7202, 7325, 9466, 30499, 30506, 30825, 30828, 30841, 30847, 31625, 31638, 31806, 31874, 42765, 48431, 45690, 53809, 71000, 75014, 92134. Total :58. SLS/196712
07/07/1968 Locos. at Messrs. Woodhams, Barry Docks Locomotives awaiting scrapping at Woodhams yard, Barry: GWR2807/57/59/61/73/4/85, GWR3612, GWR3738, GWR3802/3/14/17/22/45/50/55/62, GWR4110/5/21/41, GWR4150/6/60, GWR4247/8/53/70/7, GWR4561/6/88, GWR4612/68, GWR4920/30/42/53/64/79/83, GWR5029/43/51/80, GWR5164/93/9, GWR5224/7/39, GWR5322, GWR5521/6/32/8/9, GWR5541/2/52/3/62/72, GWR5619/37/68, GWR5900/52/67/94, GWR6023/4, GWR6619/34/88/95, GWR6960/84/9/90, GWR7027, GWR7200/2/29, GWR7325, GWR7802/12/9/20/1/2/7/8, GWR7903/27, GWR9466, GWR9629/81/82, 30499, 30506/41, 30825/8/30/41/7, 31618/25/38, 31806/74, 34007/10/6/27/8/39/46/53/8/9/67/70/2/3/81/92, 34101/5, 35001/5/6/9/10/1/8/22/5/7/9, 41312/3, 42765, 42859, 42968, 43924, 44123, 44422, 44901, 45163, 45293, 45337/79, 45491, 45690/9, 46428/47, 46512/21, 47279/98, 47324/57, 47406/93, 48173, 48431, 48518, 48624, 53808/9, 71000, 73082/96, 73129/56, 75014/69/78/9, 76017, 78018/9/22/59, 80064/72/8/9/80/97/8, 80100/4/5/35/6/50/1, 92085, 92134, 92207/14/9/40/5. A total of 209. 31618 and 43924 are scheduled for private preservation providing sufficient donations are received. SLS/196810

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/12/1951 To Service To service as British Railways Number 75014
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Patricroft (10C)
   
03/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G)    
05/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A)    
20/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G)    
12/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A)    
09/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B)    
05/05/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Bletchley (1E)    
21/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
20/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Tyseley (2A)    
19/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (6D)    
31/12/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 75014    

prev prev