|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
15/12/1963 | Swindon Works ('A' Shop) | Triangle: 3653, 8425, 9425. Yard: D1060, D7092, 2818, 3668/71/6, 4111, 4555, 4690, 4987, 6000/10/25, 6159, 6831/48/9/50/9/61, 6922, 8738, 9645, 76037/76/81. Dump: 3706, 5201, 5787, 6011, 6151, 6618/31/74, 6724, 8103, 8461/91, 8791, 9401. 'A' Shop: D812/9/24/34/5/45/61, D1006/8/16/26/7/8/9/36/40/3/5/9/65, D3031, D3515/7/97, D3603/6/7, D6328, D7003/12/26/35/58, 4113/76, 5691, 6141/3, 6866, 6976/98, 7808/12/20/6, 7928, 9600/66, 73053/93, 76041, 92003. Ex-Works: 6858. Stored on Shed: 1006/27, 3842, 4631, 4924/96, 5017, 5357, 5814, 5904/43, 9604. | SLS/196401 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
30/07/1954 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 76041 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to Neasden (34E) |
||
30/06/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A) | ||
12/12/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Willesden (1A) | ||
02/10/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Oxley (2B) | ||
11/03/1967 | Allocation | Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A) | ||
01/04/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 76041 | ||
10/1967 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cohens: Kettering |