|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
16/10/1967 | United Waggon Co., Newport (Mon.) | Dumped locomotives: 34005, 34008, 34009, 34017, 34026, 34032, 34047, 34057, 34088, 34098, 34104, 34108, 48249, 48509, 73002, 73016, 76039, 76058, 76063, 76088, 78063, 82003, 82031, 82034. | SLS/196712 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1955 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 76058 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to Redhill (75B) |
||
26/11/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) | ||
31/12/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B) | ||
05/03/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) | ||
27/06/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to Guildford (70C) | ||
09/1966 | Scrapped | Broken up by Buttigiegs: Newport | ||
26/03/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 76058 |